Brian Whitaker v. Phillips Hutton Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Phillips Hutton Partners, LLC and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv00882
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker.. (Price, Dennis)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Case, #11 filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Price, Dennis)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Phillips Hutton Partners, LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Donna Doe -Authorized to accept service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Starbucks Corporation answer now due 7/11/2019, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Robert W Conti added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Conti, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 PNA, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Proof of Service) (Price, Dennis)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY (Becky De George-Agent for service) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/8/2019. (lb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Phillips Hutton Partners, LLC, and Starbucks Corporation. (jtil)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23714990 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Phillips Hutton Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Hutton Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Ashley D Stein
Represented By: Robert W Conti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?