Obria Group Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Obria Group Inc. and Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Roger Severino and Alex M. Azar
Case Number: 8:2019cv00905
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Rassbach, Eric)
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California, upon Defendant Roger Severino served on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Genoveva Ortega, Legal Assistant. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to (Signature unreadable). Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Rassbach, Eric)
June 7, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California, upon Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Genoveva Ortega, Legal Assistant. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to (Signature unreadable). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Shantell Jiggetts. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Rassbach, Eric)
June 7, 2019 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California, upon Defendant Alex M. Azar served on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Genoveva Ortega, Legal Assistant. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to (Signature unreadable). Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Shantell Jiggetts. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher C Pagliarella APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Obria Group, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation; and Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California, a California non-profit corporation, designating Rosa M.C. Cumare as local counsel. (bm)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Mark L Rienzi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Obria Group, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation; and Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California, a California non-profit corporation, designating Rosa M.C. Cumare as local counsel. (bm)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Lori H Windham APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Obria Group, Inc., a California nonprofit corporation; and Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California, a California non-profit corporation, designating Rosa M.C. Cumare as local counsel. (bm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher C. Pagliarella to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23778765) filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Proof of Service) (Cumare, Rosa Maria)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark L. Rienzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23778705) filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Proof of Service) (Cumare, Rosa Maria)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori H. Windham to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23778353) filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Proof of Service) (Cumare, Rosa Maria)
May 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rosa Maria Christina Cumare on behalf of Plaintiffs Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California (Attorney Rosa Maria Christina Cumare added to party Obria Group Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Rosa Maria Christina Cumare added to party Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California(pty:pla))(Cumare, Rosa Maria)
May 16, 2019 Filing 22 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant William Barr, Attorney General of the United States. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Nicola T. Hana, United States Attorney's Office. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Roger Severino. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: A temporary restraining order (TRO) flag was indicated, but no TRO document was filed. The TRO flag will be removed. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Chris Pagliarella. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lori H. Windham. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark L. Rienzi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California, (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Rassbach, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23734154 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Obria Group Inc., Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California. (Attorney Eric Rassbach added to party Obria Group Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Eric Rassbach added to party Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California(pty:pla))(Rassbach, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obria Group Inc. et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Severino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obria Group Inc.
Represented By: Eric Rassbach
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Represented By: Eric C Rassbach
Represented By: Rosa Maria Christina Cumare
Represented By: Christopher C Pagliarella
Represented By: Mark L Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obria Medical Clinics of Southern California
Represented By: Eric Rassbach
Represented By: Lori H Windham
Represented By: Eric C Rassbach
Represented By: Rosa Maria Christina Cumare
Represented By: Christopher C Pagliarella
Represented By: Mark L Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?