Yan Sui v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Yan Sui
Defendant: Does 1 - 10, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., County of Orange, Marissa M. Dennis, Ricky M. Martinez, City of Costa Mesa, Eric F. King, Orange County Association of Realtors, John Chace and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2019cv00928
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge John A. Kronstadt, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (shb)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE (DKT. 31) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order STRIKES the Notice. Absent an operative complaint, an action is subject to dismissal. Plaintiffs 14-day window for amending the complaint has expired. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 33 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE TO SUPPORT "SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF YAN SUI TO REQUEST AN ORDER BY HON. CHIEF JUDGE VIRGINIA A. PHILIPS TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT PURSUANT 28 U.S.CODE SECTION 455(a); CANON 3C(1); DECLARATION OF YAN SUI IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Plaintiff Yan Sui. (shb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Motions and Related Filings - select - Responses/Replies and Other Motion Related Filings - select - For Judicial Notice. Other error(s) with document(s): The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall take notice of the CM/ECF procedures. Any future document will be stricken for failure to follow the procedures.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 30 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re: MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #29 (Wallace, Marshall)
June 10, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Judge John A. Kronstadt #23 and Request for Sanctions filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wallace, Marshall)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order DENYING Plaintiff's motion to disqualify Judge Kronstadt by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez denying #23 MOTION to Disqualify Judge: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion to disqualify Judge Kronstadt is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
June 6, 2019 Filing 31 [STRICKEN PER DKT. #34 . NOTICE TO DISMISS W/O PREJUDICE AND WITHDRAWAL OF CAUSES OF ACTION ALLEGED UNDER FEDERAL PENAL CODES filed by plaintiff Yan Sui. (es) Modified on 6/18/2019 (shb).
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Costa Mesa, (Lindsay, Bruce)
June 5, 2019 Filing 26 JOINDER in REQUEST to Strike Complaint #14 and Notice of Related Cases filed by Defendant City of Costa Mesa. (Attorney Bruce A Lindsay added to party City of Costa Mesa(pty:dft))(Lindsay, Bruce)
June 5, 2019 Filing 25 JOINDER filed by Defendant City of Costa Mesa joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Lindsay, Bruce)
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 REFERRAL OF MOTION to Disqualify Judge John A. Kronstadt has been filed. Pursuant to GO 19-03 and Local Rule 72-5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Judge John A. Kronstadt #23 is referred to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for determination. (rn)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge John A. Kronstadt, ORDERING Special Appearance of Yan Sui to Oppose Defendant County of Orange's Notice of Motion and Motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint submitted by Plaintiff Yan Sui received on May 29, 2019 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: The Complaint in this action has been stricken (Dkt. 19), and thus County of Orange's Motion to Dismiss, to which this filing purports to respond, has already been dismissed as moot. (shb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Judge John A. Kronstadt and Declaration in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Yan Sui. (rn)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE VEXATIOUS LITIGANT FILING by Judge John A. Kronstadt, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the documents presented not be filed. (shb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.S REQUEST TO STRIKE COMPLAINT (DKT. 14); DEFENDANT COUNTY OF ORANGES MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT(DKT. 16) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Request is GRANTED IN PART. The Complaint is STRICKEN. Any proposed amended complaint must be presented no later than June 12, 2019 for pre-filing review, in accordance with the terms of the Pre-Filing Order. If no such application is timely made, this action will be dismissed with prejudice. Defendant County of Oranges Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. 16) is MOOT. (shb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: SA 19-00928 JAK (FFMx). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials JVS on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. #17 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 13-01607-JAK (FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge James V. Selna to Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 19-00928-JAK (FFMx). Signed by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (dv)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant County of Orange. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Desmond, Chelsea)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., (1) Notice of Assignment to United States Judges and (2) Initial Order Following Filing of Complaint Assigned to Judge Selna served on May 23, 2019. (Wallace, Marshall)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST to Strike Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Request to Strike Complaint) (Wallace, Marshall)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on May 17, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Wallace, Marshall)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Notice of Joinder of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Orange County Association of Realtors. (Jacobson, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 JOINDER filed by Defendant County of Orange joining in Notice of Related Case(s), #4 . (Desmond, Chelsea)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The pro se litigants email address was added to CM/ECF in error upon the opening of this Notice of Removal case. The pro se litigants email will be removed from CM/ECF and will not be used for electronic service without the appropriate registration and consent. See Local Rule 5-3. (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Notice of Related Case(s), #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on May 17, 2019. (Wallace, Marshall)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant County of Orange, identifying Yan Sui, County of Orange, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Eric F. King, John Chace, Ricky M. Martinez, City of Costa Mesa, Orange County Association of Realtors, Marissa M. Dennis. (Attorney Chelsea M Desmond added to party County of Orange(pty:dft))(Desmond, Chelsea)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants John Chace, City of Costa Mesa, County of Orange, Marissa M. Dennis, Does, Eric F. King, Ricky M. Martinez, Orange County Association of Realtors, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Yan Sui. (Filed in state court 3/28/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 8) (esa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 JOINDER filed by Defendant County of Orange joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Desmond, Chelsea)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. AND REQUEST TO STRIKE COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE UNDER PRE-FILING ORDER Related Case(s): CV-13-01607 JAK (AJW); 8:11-bk-20448-CB; 15-cv-00059-JAK; 16-cv-002230-JAK; 8:18-cv-01662-JAK (Wallace, Marshall)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., identifying Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s parent company, Wells Fargo & Co.. (Wallace, Marshall)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wallace, Marshall)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01060792-CU-CO-CXC Receipt No: 0973-23753151 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J) (Attorney Marshall C Wallace added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Wallace, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yan Sui v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marshall C Wallace
Represented By: Abby L Bloetscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Orange
Represented By: Daniel K Spradlin
Represented By: Chelsea M Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa M. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Costa Mesa
Represented By: Monica Choi Arredondo
Represented By: Bruce A Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric F. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Association of Realtors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Sui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?