Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.187.148.5

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.187.148.5
Case Number: 8:2019cv00934
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Take Early Discovery #7 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The court grants plaintiff's application, but with certain additional protective measures. (See document for details.) (sbou)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall immediately serve the complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on all parties, including this Order on any new parties to the action and file the proofs of service pursuant to Local Rule 5-3.1 with the Court. See order for details. (shb)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH (SPx). Case transferred from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv00934 TJH (SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (esa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #3 Proposed Order) (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) And John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23755836 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.187.148.5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.187.148.5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?