Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.39.101

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.39.101
Case Number: 8:2019cv00936
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) (In Chambers) Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Take Early Discovery #9 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. The court grants plaintiff's application, but with certain additional protective measures. (See document for details.) (sbou)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH (SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson and Judge George H. Wu to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-00936 TJH (SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (esa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #3 Proposed Order) (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu (bm)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) And John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23755905 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.39.101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.39.101
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?