Josue Romero Rodriguez v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Josue Romero Rodriguez
Defendant: PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc., BMW of North America, LLC, and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv00947
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than April 10, 2020. (tg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 7/5/2019, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc..(Attorney Robert Kenneth Dixon added to party PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dixon, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-6 days, filed by Plaintiff Josue Romero Rodriguez.. (Lee, Vanessa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexandra Lee Preece counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,. Alexandra L. Preece is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Preece, Alexandra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ismael Bautista, Jr counsel for Defendant PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc.. John D. Bronstein is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc. dba Creview BMW. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bautista, Ismael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Parada Kovadi Ornelas counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,. Adding Parada K. Ornelas as counsel of record for BMW of North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attorney Parada Kovadi Ornelas added to party BMW of North America, LLC,(pty:dft))(Ornelas, Parada)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 Amended STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc. answer now due 6/4/2019, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by defendant PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc..(Attorney Ismael Bautista, Jr added to party PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bautista, Ismael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BMW of North America, LLC, answer now due 6/4/2019, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,.(Attorney Ismael Bautista, Jr added to party BMW of North America, LLC,(pty:dft))(Bautista, Ismael)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 7/5/2019 at 10:30 A.M. (tg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexandra Lee Preece on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, (Preece, Alexandra)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vickie E Turner on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, (Turner, Vickie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
May 17, 2019 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa)
May 17, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Josue Romero Rodriguez, upon Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, served on 4/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 8, p. 2) (esa)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants BMW of North America, LLC,, Does, PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Josue Romero Rodriguez. (Filed in state court 4/12/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Jury Demand #4 served on 5/17/2019. (Dixon, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,.. (Dixon, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,, (Dixon, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,. (Dixon, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2019-01063311-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23762075 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO of Removal, #2 Exhibit Decl. Ex. A Complaint, #3 Exhibit Decl. Ex. B Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Decl. Ex. C BMW NA Answer, #5 Declaration Decl. Ex. D, #6 Declaration Decl. Ex. E, #7 Declaration Decl. Ex. F, #8 Declaration Decl. Ex. G - All pleadings) (Attorney Robert Kenneth Dixon added to party BMW of North America, LLC,(pty:dft))(Dixon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Josue Romero Rodriguez v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Romero Rodriguez
Represented By: Christopher Michael Lovasz
Represented By: Vanessa Marie Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAG Santa Ana B1, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Dixon
Represented By: Ismael Bautista, Jr
Represented By: John D Bronstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC,
Represented By: Robert Kenneth Dixon
Represented By: Parada Kovadi Ornelas
Represented By: Alexandra Lee Preece
Represented By: Vickie E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?