The Schwartz E Liquid v. Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation and The Schwartz E Liquid
Defendant: Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc., a Florida corporation, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00978
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott W Ditfurth counsel for Defendant Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc.. Adding Scott W. Ditfurth as counsel of record for Syndicate Global Districution, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc.. (Attorney Scott W Ditfurth added to party Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ditfurth, Scott)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mindi M. Richter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24011819) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mindi M. Richter to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24011819) filed by Defendant Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Appear Pro Hac) (Berman, Steven)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant, Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc. Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc..(Berman, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven M Berman on behalf of Defendant Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc. (Attorney Steven M Berman added to party Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc.(pty:dft))(Berman, Steven)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation. (Adams, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation. (Adams, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation, (Adams, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation. (Adams, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23785925 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Michael D Adams added to party The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation(pty:pla))(Adams, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Schwartz E Liquid v. Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc., a Florida corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate Global Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Mindi M Richter
Represented By: Steven M Berman
Represented By: Scott W Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Schwartz E Liquid, a California corporation
Represented By: Michael D Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Schwartz E Liquid
Represented By: Michael D Adams
Represented By: Meredith Louise Williams
Represented By: Seth Morgan Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?