ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Health Net of Arizona Inc et al
Plaintiff: ABC Services Group, Inc.
Defendant: Health Net, Inc., Health Net of Arizona Inc, CENTENE CORPORATION and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01011
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The Court resets all pending motions to November 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel waive oral argument. The Court takes the motions UNDER SUBMISSION. All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 19-0243- DOC (DFMx). Case numbers SA CV 19-0317-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0530-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0677-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0776-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0777-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0789-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0803-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0804-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-1000-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-1011-DOC (DFMx). shall be CLOSED (JS-6). Made JS-6. Case Terminated. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John M LeBlanc counsel for Defendant Health Net of Arizona Inc. Adding Samuel A. Canales as counsel of record for Health Net of Arizona, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Health Net of Arizona, Inc.. (LeBlanc, John)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 SECCOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #26 , filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Garner, Craig)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc... (Garner, Craig)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #27 . 1. Health Nets deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint is continued from October 4, 2019 to October 25, 2019. 2. Plaintiff will file a Second Amended Complaint by October 11, 2019, in accordance with the Parties stipulation above. (twdb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Health Net of Arizona Inc answer now due 10/25/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #26 filed by Defendant Health Net of Arizona Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Ileana)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Health Net of Arizona, Inc. Health Net of Arizona Inc amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Garner, Craig)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCES AND PENDING MOTIONS TO 10/18/19 AT 8:30 AM AND SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE FOR 10/18/19 AT 8:30 AM. Scheduling Conference re-set for 10/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets a Status Conference for SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) for October 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Court requests the presence of Robert OBrien as Special Master in SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) ABC Services Group, Inc. v United Healthcare Services, et al. (twdb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #23 . Health Nets deadline to respond to the Complaint is continued from September 6, 2019 to October 4, 2019. Plaintiff will file an amended Complaint by September 20, 2019. (twdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Health Net of Arizona Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Ileana)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #21 . Health Nets deadline to respond to the Complaint is continued from August 16, 2019 to September 6, 2019. (twdb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Centene Corporation answer now due 9/6/2019; Health Net, Inc. answer now due 9/6/2019; Health Net of Arizona Inc answer now due 9/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Centene Corporation; Health Net, Inc.; Health Net of Arizona Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Ileana)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Centene Corporation. (Garner, Craig)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCES AND PENDING MOTIONS TO OCTOBER 7, 2019 AT 8:30 AM AND SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 7, AT 8:30 AM. The Scheduling Conferences and any pending motions in the above cases will be reset to 10/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets a Status Conference for SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) for October 7, 2019 at 8:30 a.m.The Court requests the presence of Robert OBrien as Special Master in SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) ABC Services Group, Inc. v United Healthcare Services, et al. (twdb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Centene Corporation answer now due 8/16/2019; Health Net, Inc. answer now due 8/16/2019; Health Net of Arizona Inc answer now due 8/16/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Centene Corporation; Health Net, Inc.; Health Net of Arizona Inc.(Attorney Craig S Bloomgarden added to party Centene Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S Bloomgarden added to party Health Net of Arizona Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Craig S Bloomgarden added to party Health Net, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bloomgarden, Craig)
June 29, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DAISY MONTENEGRO, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garner, Craig)
June 29, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., upon Defendant Centene Corporation served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DAISY MONTENEGRO, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Garner, Craig)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Standing Order for Civil Case Assigned to Judge Carter filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from T. Mark Tubis to Craig B. Garner. filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., (Garner, Craig)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00243 DOC(DFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish and Judge John F. Walter to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01011 DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net of Arizona Inc, Health Net, Inc. (Attachments: #1 HN of Arizona, #2 HN, Inc.) (jtil)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., identifying ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23807685 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Craig B Garner added to party ABC Services Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Garner, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Health Net of Arizona Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Craig B Garner
Represented By: Rochelle J Bioteau
Represented By: Tal Mark Tubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory N Pimstone
Represented By: Craig S Bloomgarden
Represented By: John M LeBlanc
Represented By: Ileana M Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net of Arizona Inc
Represented By: Gregory N Pimstone
Represented By: Craig S Bloomgarden
Represented By: John M LeBlanc
Represented By: Ileana M Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTENE CORPORATION
Represented By: Gregory N Pimstone
Represented By: Craig S Bloomgarden
Represented By: John M LeBlanc
Represented By: Ileana M Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?