Tiffany Abraham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Ms Tiffany Abraham
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2019cv01079
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV19-1079 PLA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 6/10/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ch)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (ch)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 is hereby GRANTED. (ch)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham. (Monge, Troy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham. (Monge, Troy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham. (Monge, Troy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham, (Monge, Troy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham. (Monge, Troy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Tiffany Abraham(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiffany Abraham v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Tiffany Abraham
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?