Leslie Salinas v. Federal Express Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Salinas
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01084
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: On July 11, 2019, counsel for Defendant filed a "Notice of Settlement". The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court within 30 days. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Warden, Jenna)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Conformed Copy of Answer to Complaint) re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Warden, Jenna)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement & Certifcation & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation, identifying FedEx Corporation. (Attorney Christopher J Yost added to party Federal Express Corporation(pty:dft))(Yost, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO CONSENT filed by Defendant Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Yost, Christopher)
June 3, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3)(ghap)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leslie Salinas, upon Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Demonte-CT Corporation System-Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2) (ghap)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Federal Express Corporation. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Leslie Salinas. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/28/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ghap).
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Matthew Endlish re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Warden, Jenna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Usama Kahf re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Warden, Jenna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Related Case(s): 0 (Warden, Jenna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., identifying Federal Express Corporation; Leslie Salinas. (Warden, Jenna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Warden, Jenna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Corporate Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. (Kahf, Usama)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-01041242-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23848144 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Jenna M Warden added to party FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.(pty:dft))(Warden, Jenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leslie Salinas v. Federal Express Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By: Jenna M Warden
Represented By: Usama Kahf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Salinas
Represented By: Dwight Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?