Bethany Regan v. Medieval Knights, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bethany Regan
Defendant: Medieval Knights, LLC, Does 1 through 25, inclusive and Medieval Times California, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01100
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-6 days, filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC.. (Morris, James)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Denying #15 Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference Currently Set for August 5, 2019 (es)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 First STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from August 5, 2019 to first available hearing date Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #11 filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference)(Nayagam, Kimberly)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARDING HEARING DATE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: In the interests of justice, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. 10) to August 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (es)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #10 filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC. (Nayagam, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Bethany Regan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bethany Regan)(Underwood, Jerry)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration James A. Black, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration Laurie Smiley, #6 Exhibit D - Part 1, #7 Exhibit D - Part 2, #8 Exhibit D - Part 3, #9 Exhibit D - Part 4, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Declaration Julie Muenzler, #14 Declaration James L. Morris) (Nayagam, Kimberly)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
June 4, 2019 COPY OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Bethany Regan pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Medieval Times California, Inc. (Filed in state court 5/6/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
June 4, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Bethany Regan, upon Defendant Medieval Times California, Inc. served on 3/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 2) (esa)
June 4, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Bethany Regan, upon Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC served on 3/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
June 4, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Medieval Knights, LLC, Medieval Times California, Inc., Jury Demand,, filed by plaintiff Bethany Regan. (Filed in state court 3/18/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 served on 6/4/19. (Morris, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC. Related Case(s): None (Morris, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC, (Morris, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Morris, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Kevin J. Ralphs re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC. (Morris, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC. (Morris, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2019-01058249 Receipt No: 0973-23855125 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Medieval Knights, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet and Summons, #3 Exhibit Service Documents, #4 Exhibit Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit Dismissal, #6 Exhibit Part 1 - Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #7 Exhibit Part 2 - Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #8 Exhibit Part 3 - Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #9 Exhibit Part 4 - Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #10 Exhibit Change of Address, #11 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Attorney James L Morris added to party Medieval Knights, LLC(pty:dft))(Morris, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethany Regan v. Medieval Knights, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medieval Knights, LLC
Represented By: James L Morris
Represented By: Kimberly A Nayagam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medieval Times California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Regan
Represented By: Jerry D Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?