Roy Yiun v. Mi A Dong, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roy Yiun
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, US Millennium, L.P. and Mi A Dong, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01120
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (mku)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Discovery cut-off 3/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 8:30 a.m. Jury Trial set for 6/30/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (mku)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER FOR EARLY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 9:00 AM. (es)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Mi A Dong, Inc., US Millennium, L.P. (et)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ROY YIUN, (Kim, Jason)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ROY YIUN. (Kim, Jason)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ROY YIUN. (Kim, Jason)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23868816 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ROY YIUN. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party ROY YIUN(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy Yiun v. Mi A Dong, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Millennium, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi A Dong, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Yiun
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?