Peter Lamirand v. Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Lamirand
Defendant: Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01123
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #16 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for thirty (30) days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. (Imara, Tazamisha)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Held and continued. Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2019 @ 1:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. Parties with settlement authority to be present. Court Reporter: CourtSmart; Courtroom Deputy: Deborah Lewman; Plaintiff Attorney: Sujith Divakaran; Defendant Attorney: Carolyn E. Sieve; Time in Ccourt: :19. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (dgo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tazamisha Heshima Imara on behalf of Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. (Attorney Tazamisha Heshima Imara added to party Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Imara, Tazamisha)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-7 days, filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc... (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. (ATTACHED TO #11 AS EXHIBIT A).(twdb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Standing Order filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Errata re Defendant's Notice of Removal to United States District Court filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
June 5, 2019 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
June 5, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Peter Lamirand. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/7/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Tina M. Jeffcoat re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. identifying Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Peter Lamirand and Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. Related Case(s): N/A (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. (Sieve, Carolyn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01056092-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23869473 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Court Docket) (Attorney Carolyn E Sieve added to party Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sieve, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Lamirand v. Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lamirand
Represented By: Brent S Buchsbaum
Represented By: Laurel N Haag
Represented By: Sujith Divakaran
Represented By: Gary R Carlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellingham Marine Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn E Sieve
Represented By: Tazamisha Heshima Imara
Represented By: Kimberly T Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?