Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc. v. Jim Davidson et al
Plaintiff: Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc.
Defendant: Jim Davidson, Does 1 through 50, inclusive and DOES 1-50 inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01132
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendant Jim Davidson. (Cole, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Plaintiff Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc.. (Lazo, Marc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, GRANTING #10 Non-Resident Attorney Francisco E. Connell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc., designating Marc Lazo as local counsel. (es)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Francisco E. Connell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24070041) filed by Plaintiff Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Order on Application) (Lazo, Marc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jim Davidson. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Jim Davidson's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Cole, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court with the Superior Court for the County of Orange filed by defendant Jim Davidson. (Cole, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc. filed in Orange County Superior Court on 5/7/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Jim Davidson, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on June 6, 2019. (Cole, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jim Davidson, identifying James R. Davidson, Jr.. (Cole, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jim Davidson. (Cole, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01068349-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: 0973-23878448 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Jim Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Cto Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration of William P. Cole, #5 Declaration of Brian Wallach, #6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brial Wallach, #7 Declaration of James R. Davidson, Jr.) (Attorney William P Cole added to party Jim Davidson(pty:dft))(Cole, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc. v. Jim Davidson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Davidson
Represented By: William P Cole
Represented By: Delavan J Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solutionz Videoconferencing, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Represented By: Angie Van-Anh Phung
Represented By: Francisco E Connell
Represented By: Grace M Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?