Jesus Resendiz v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Resendiz
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company and First American Financial Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01137
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 45 STATUS CONFERENCE (Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer: A further Status Conference is set for 10/28/2019 at 11:00 AM. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kent, Ronald)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING CERTAIN DEADLINES by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (gk)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #39 Non-Resident Attorney Amy E Keller APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz, designating Andrew D Stolper as local counsel. (jp)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #38 Non-Resident Attorney Adam J Levitt APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz, designating Andrew Stolper as local counsel. (jp)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
July 1, 2019 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Keller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24014729) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 38 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. Levitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24014670) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01009 DSF(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick and Judge James V. Selna to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01137 DSF(Ex). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company, identifying First American Title Company; First American Title Insurance Company (defendant), First American Financial Corporation (parent / defendant); Jesus Resendiz (plaintiff), AIG (insurer). (Attorney Paul M Kakuske added to party First American Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul M Kakuske added to party First American Title Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Kakuske, Paul)
June 28, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Insurance Company. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01009, 8:19-cv-01022, 8:19-cv-01023, 8:19-cv-01040, 8:19-cv-01051, 8:19-cv-01078, 8:19-cv-01102, 8:19-cv-01112, 8:19-cv-01105, 8:19-cv-01156, 8:19-cv-01180, 8:19-cv-01176, 8:19-cv-01234, 8:19-cv-05552 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kakuske, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Petition to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation for Consolidation Before the Honorable Andrew J. Gilford filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Stolper, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #31 Non-Resident Attorney Stuart A. Davidson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jesus Resendiz, designating Andrew D. Stolper as local counsel. (es)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/5/2019. (lb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stuart A. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 6/13/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23917975) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #24 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher C. Gold APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz, designating Andrew D. Stolper as local counsel. (es)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #23 Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz, designating Andrew D. Stolper as local counsel. (es)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #21 Non-Resident Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz, designating Andrew D. Stolper as local counsel. (es)
June 13, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stuart A. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23917975) #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Local counsel failed to sign application. (lt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23918132) #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher C. Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23918160) #24 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23917895) #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bradley M. Beall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23908909) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher C. Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23918160) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23918132) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stuart A. Davidson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23917975) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23917895) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #18 Non-Resident Attorney Bradley M. Beall APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz, designating Andrew D. Stolper as local counsel. (es)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz, identifying First American Financial Corporation & First American Title Insurance Company. (Stolper, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bradley M. Beall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23908909) filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Florida), #2 Certificate of Good Standing (Minnesota), #3 Proposed Order) (Stolper, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 19-01102-JVS (DFMx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: SACV19-01137JVS (DFMx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (dv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bradley M. Beall. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ricardo J. Marenco. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dorothy P. Antullis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher C. Gold. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stuart A. Davidson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Amy E. Keller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Adam J. Levitt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant First American Financial Corporation. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attachments: #1 Summons Re First American Title Insurance Company)(Stolper, Andrew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Stolper, Andrew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23882489 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jesus Resendiz. (Attorney Andrew D Stolper added to party Jesus Resendiz(pty:pla))(Stolper, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Resendiz v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul M Kakuske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: Paul M Kakuske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Resendiz
Represented By: Andrew D Stolper
Represented By: Dorothy P Antullis
Represented By: Christopher C Gold
Represented By: Bradley M Beall
Represented By: Ricardo J Marenco
Represented By: Stuart A Davidson
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Scott Howard Sims
Represented By: Jason M Frank
Represented By: Amy E Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?