James Ross v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: James Ross
Defendant: First American Title Company and First American Financial Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01176
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 STATUS CONFERENCE (Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer: A further Status Conference is set for 10/28/2019 at 11:00 AM. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Ross. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sobol, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING CERTAIN DEADLINES by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (gk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to First American Title Company answer now due 8/2/2019; First American Financial Corporation answer now due 8/2/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants First American Title Company; First American Financial Corporation.(Attorney Joel D Siegel added to party First American Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Joel D Siegel added to party First American Title Company(pty:dft))(Siegel, Joel)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Sean Petterson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Ross, designating Michael W Sobol as local counsel. (jp)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Jason L Lichtman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Ross, designating Michael W Sobol as local counsel. (jp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sean A. Petterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Ross (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23961884) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason L. Lichtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Ross (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23961782) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. NY and IL has attorney in NY, but DC has attorney in CA. (lt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Ross, upon Defendant First American Title Company served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lai Saevang, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sobol, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Ross, upon Defendant First American Financial Corporation served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lai Saevang, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sobol, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sean A. Petterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Ross (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23961884) filed by Plaintiff James Ross. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Sobol, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason L. Lichtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff James Ross (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23961782) filed by Plaintiff James Ross. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Sobol, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01009 DSF(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01176 DSF(Ex). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sean A Petterson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason L Lichtman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Company. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff James Ross, (Sobol, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff James Ross. (Sobol, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Ross. (Sobol, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23914343 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff James Ross. (Attorney Michael W Sobol added to party James Ross(pty:pla))(Sobol, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Ross v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Represented By: Joel D Siegel
Represented By: Ronald D Kent
Represented By: Paul M Kakuske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: Joel D Siegel
Represented By: Ronald D Kent
Represented By: Paul M Kakuske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ross
Represented By: Michael W Sobol
Represented By: Jason L Lichtman
Represented By: Sean Petterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?