Lasheeda Forney et al v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brooke Wray Hager, Lasheeda Forney and Ryan Goodyear
Defendant: First American Title Company and First American Financial Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01180
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: Dale S Fischer
3 Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS CONFERENCE (Held and Completed) before Judge Dale S. Fischer: A further Status Conference is set for 10/28/2019 at 11:00 AM. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants First American Financial Corporation, First American Title Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kent, Ronald)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING CERTAIN DEADLINES by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (gk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lasheeda Forney, Brooke Wray Hager, Ryan Goodyear, upon Defendant First American Financial Corporation served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/4/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ozzello, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lasheeda Forney, Brooke Wray Hager, Ryan Goodyear, upon Defendant First American Title Company served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/4/2019. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Ozzello, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to First American Financial Corporation answer now due 8/4/2019; First American Title Company answer now due 8/4/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants First American Financial Corporation ; First American Title Company.(Attorney Joel D Siegel added to party First American Financial Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Joel D Siegel added to party First American Title Company(pty:dft))(Siegel, Joel)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 19-01009-DSF (Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge James V. Selna to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 19-01180-DSF (Ex). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dv)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant First American Title Company. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant First American Financial Corporation. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:19-cv-01180-JVS (JDEx). (et)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lasheeda Forney, Ryan Goodyear, Brooke Wray Hager, (Padgett, Cody)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lasheeda Forney, Ryan Goodyear, Brooke Wray Hager. (Padgett, Cody)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Lasheeda Forney, Ryan Goodyear, Brooke Wray Hager. (Padgett, Cody)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Lasheeda Forney, Ryan Goodyear, Brooke Wray Hager. (Padgett, Cody)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23910599 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Lasheeda Forney, Brooke Wray Hager, Ryan Goodyear. (Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Lasheeda Forney(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Ryan Goodyear(pty:pla), Attorney Cody R Padgett added to party Brooke Wray Hager(pty:pla))(Padgett, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasheeda Forney et al v. First American Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Wray Hager
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R Padgett
Represented By: Ivy T Ngo
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasheeda Forney
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R Padgett
Represented By: Ivy T Ngo
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Goodyear
Represented By: Tarek H Zohdy
Represented By: Cody R Padgett
Represented By: Ivy T Ngo
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Represented By: Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Represented By: Joel D Siegel
Represented By: Paul M Kakuske
Represented By: Ronald D Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: Joel D Siegel
Represented By: Paul M Kakuske
Represented By: Ronald D Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?