Coast Dental Services LLC v. Karla Andrade et al
Plaintiff: Coast Dental Services LLC
Defendant: Rosie Munoz, Erika Lazo, Ashmeen Nisha, Karla Andrade and Alejandro Omega
Case Number: 8:2019cv01181
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 41 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Bien, Rachel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bien, Rachel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 39 STATEMENT of COAST DENTAL SERVICES, LLC'S RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Weisburd, Steven)
August 7, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Bien, Rachel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Weisburd, Steven)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Paolo C. Meireles APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha and Alejandro Omega, designating Rachel Bien as local counsel. (lom)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Paul W. Mollica APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha and Alejandro Omega, designating Rachel Bien as local counsel. (lom)
July 31, 2019 Filing 34 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #15 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weisburd, Steven)
July 31, 2019 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Bien, Rachel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 32 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes of Fact in Support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Bien, Rachel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Rachel Bien in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bien, Rachel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Bien, Rachel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paolo C. Meireles to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24179659) filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bien, Rachel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul W. Mollica to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/26/2019, Receipt No. 26J356S8) filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bien, Rachel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul W. Mollica to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24155309) #23 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 23 is stricken for the reason stated in the Notice #25 filed on July 29, 2019. (shb)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Lucy B Bansal APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha and Alejandro Omega, designating Rachel Bien as local counsel. (lom)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul W. Mollica to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24155309) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lucy B. Bansal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24155682) filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bien, Rachel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 [STRICKEN PER RESPONSE G-112-B, DKT. #27 . APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul W. Mollica to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24155309) filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bien, Rachel) Modified on 7/30/2019 (shb).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Standing Order Re Summary Judgment Motions by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The time to appear at the MOTIONS #15 #16 , set for August 22, 2019, are ADVANCED from 10:00 a.m. to 8:30 a.m. Judge Wu hears Civil matters at 8:30 a.m. only. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weisburd, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Weisburd, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Samantha Croxford In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Weisburd, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Cathleen Bell Bremmer In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 #16 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(Weisburd, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Weisburd, Steven)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Declaration of Rachel Bien in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) (Bien, Rachel)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, Granting Stipulation for Briefing and Hearing Schedule on the Parties' Respective Motions #12 . The Parties intend to file motions in this action on 7/15/19; Responses due by 7/31/2019, Replies due by 8/7/2019. (twdb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel Bien on behalf of Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega (Attorney Rachel Bien added to party Karla Andrade(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Bien added to party Erika Lazo(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Bien added to party Rosie Munoz(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Bien added to party Ashmeen Nisha(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Bien added to party Alejandro Omega(pty:dft))(Bien, Rachel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Order for Briefing and Hearing Schedule on the Parties' Respective Motions filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weisburd, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 served on 06/20/2019. (Weisburd, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Karla Andrade, Erika Lazo, Rosie Munoz, Ashmeen Nisha, Alejandro Omega. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC, identifying Intelident Solutions, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; Intelident Holdings, Inc., a Delaware corporation; Karla Andrade; Erika Lazo; Rosie Munoz; Ashmeen Nisha; Alejandro Omega. (Weisburd, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-02995-JSM-SPF(M.D. Fla.) (Weisburd, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC identifying Intelident Holdings, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Affiliate) as Corporate Parent. (Weisburd, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Weisburd, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Weisburd, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23918072 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Coast Dental Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (Attorney Steven Bennett Weisburd added to party Coast Dental Services LLC(pty:pla))(Weisburd, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coast Dental Services LLC v. Karla Andrade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Munoz
Represented By: Lucy B Bansal
Represented By: Rachel Bien
Represented By: Paul W Mollica
Represented By: Paolo C Meireles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Lazo
Represented By: Lucy B Bansal
Represented By: Rachel Bien
Represented By: Paul W Mollica
Represented By: Paolo C Meireles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashmeen Nisha
Represented By: Lucy B Bansal
Represented By: Rachel Bien
Represented By: Paul W Mollica
Represented By: Paolo C Meireles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Andrade
Represented By: Lucy B Bansal
Represented By: Rachel Bien
Represented By: Paul W Mollica
Represented By: Paolo C Meireles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Omega
Represented By: Lucy B Bansal
Represented By: Rachel Bien
Represented By: Paul W Mollica
Represented By: Paolo C Meireles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coast Dental Services LLC
Represented By: Steven Bennett Weisburd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?