Bryan Williams v. Gibbs Family Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Defendant: Willam G Deeble, Sr., Ana's Hair & Nails, Gibbs Family Properties, LLC, Does 1-10, inclusive and Anas Hair and Nail
Case Number: 8:2019cv01182
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Bryan Williams. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Cornell, Ross)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/22/2019.) (mrgo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, upon Defendant Gibbs Family Properties, LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gibbs Family Properties, LLC by Jane Doe (Terry) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, upon Defendant Anas Hair and Nail served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ana's Hair & Nail by Jane Doe in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kss)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Anas Hair and Nail, Willam G Deeble, Sr., Gibbs Family Properties, LLC. (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams, (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919276 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Bryan Williams. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Bryan Williams(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan Williams v. Gibbs Family Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willam G Deeble, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana's Hair & Nails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibbs Family Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anas Hair and Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Williams
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?