Matthew Verdiglione v. M-L Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Verdiglione
Defendant: M-L Partnership, Does 1-10, inclusive and Sleep Boutique
Case Number: 8:2019cv01183
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant M-L Partnership, identifying M-L Partnership. (Mayhew, Kimberly)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 by Clerk of Court. Counsel are ordered to file their Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. See Local Rule 7.1-1. (mrgo)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than August 21, 2019. (rrey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant M-L Partnership.(Mayhew, Kimberly)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. On July 23, 2019, the Court ordered plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione (Plaintiff) to show cause why defendant Sleep Boutique should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution after Sleep Boutique failed to timely answer the complaint. (Docket No. #12 .)The Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to diligently prosecute his claims against Sleep Boutique and has failed to comply with the Court's Order to Show Cause. The Court therefore dismisses Sleep Boutique without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with a Court order. (lom)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/30/2019.) (mrgo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Sleep Boutique served on 6/30/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sleep Boutique by John Doe (Dick) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint filed by Defendant M-L Partnership.(Attorney Kimberly Lynn Mayhew added to party M-L Partnership(pty:dft))(Mayhew, Kimberly)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kss)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants M-L Partnership, Sleep Boutique. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23919282 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Matthew Verdiglione(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Verdiglione v. M-L Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-L Partnership
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Mayhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sleep Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Verdiglione
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?