Eric Rush v. Qualia Collection Services et al
Plaintiff: Eric Rush
Defendant: AutoNation, Inc. and Qualia Collection Services
Case Number: 8:2019cv01185
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter. In the Notice of Settlement filed on August 6, 2019 #12 , the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before September 23, 2019. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until September 23, 2019. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Eric Rush. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Qualia Collection Services answer now due 9/4/2019, filed by Defendant Qualia Collection Services.(Attorney D Lilah McLean added to party Qualia Collection Services(pty:dft))(McLean, D)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Eric Rush, upon Defendant AutoNation, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Eric Rush, upon Defendant Qualia Collection Services served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants AutoNation, Inc., Qualia Collection Services. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eric Rush, (Hart, Yana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Eric Rush. (Hart, Yana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eric Rush. (Hart, Yana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23920553 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Eric Rush. (Attorney Yana A Hart added to party Eric Rush(pty:pla))(Hart, Yana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Rush v. Qualia Collection Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoNation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualia Collection Services
Represented By: D Lilah McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Rush
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Represented By: Yana A Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?