David Mccants v. Zayo Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Mark Mccants
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, inclusive and Zayo Group, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01187
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. Cause called and counsel make their appearances. The Court and counsel confer. The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (twdb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC.. (Kozeychuk, Uliana)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Electronic Filing re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #11 e-mailed to Laurie J. Rust bounced due to invalid email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to lrust@littler.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/29/2019. (lb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on June 18, 2019. (Kozeychuk, Uliana)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 served on June 14. 2019. (Kozeychuk, Uliana)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-4)(Attorney Laurie J Rust added to party Zayo Group, LLC(pty:dft))(lh)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Mark Mccants, upon Defendant Zayo Group, LLC served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/24/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3) (lh)
June 14, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 20, Zayo Group, LLC, filed by Plaintiff David Mark Mccants. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3 #1 ) (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC (Kozeychuk, Uliana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC. (Kozeychuk, Uliana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC, (Kozeychuk, Uliana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC. (Kozeychuk, Uliana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2019-01069630 Receipt No: 0973-23922242 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elisabeth Rolander, #2 Declaration of Uliana Kozeychuk, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Uliana Kozeychuk, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Uliana Kozeychuk, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Uliana Kozeychuk) (Attorney Uliana A Kozeychuk added to party Zayo Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Kozeychuk, Uliana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Mccants v. Zayo Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: Laurie J Rust
Represented By: Uliana A Kozeychuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mark Mccants
Represented By: John E Lattin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?