John Ho v. AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC
Plaintiff: John Ho
Defendant: AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01196
Filed: June 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Ho, upon Defendant AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Siran Oganesian, Clerk at Studio City Mailboxes in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tsao, Pamela)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 The Court has reviewed the Stipulation filed at docket entry 9. Counsel for plaintiff shall file the proof of service of the summons and complaint on or before August 9, 2019. Text Only Entry THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 12, 2019 filed by DEFENDANT AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC.(Attorney Ian Scott Landsberg added to party AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC(pty:dft))(Landsberg, Ian)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
June 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
June 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Ho, (Tsao, Pamela)
June 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John Ho. (Tsao, Pamela)
June 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23927549 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff John Ho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Pamela Tsao added to party John Ho(pty:pla))(Tsao, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Ho v. AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Zone Santa Ana, LLC
Represented By: Ian Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ho
Represented By: Pamela Tsao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?