Corazon Velasquez v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC,
Plaintiff: Corazon Velasquez
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01197
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE by Judge James V. Selna, IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 75 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. #12 Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement Corazon Velasquez. (Kent, Trinette)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2, filed by Plaintiff Corazon Velasquez.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kent, Trinette)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Corazon Velasquez, upon Defendant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jim DiVincenzo, Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kent, Trinette)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/29/2019. (lb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Corazon Velasquez. (Kent, Trinette)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Corazon Velasquez, (Kent, Trinette)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23928018 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Corazon Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Trinette Gragirena Kent added to party Corazon Velasquez(pty:pla))(Kent, Trinette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corazon Velasquez v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corazon Velasquez
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?