UPL NA, Inc. v. Tide International (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UPL NA, Inc.
Defendant: Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd., Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd. and Tide International (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01201
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd., Tide International (USA), Inc., Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd..(DeBodo, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd. answer now due 8/11/2019; Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd. answer now due 8/11/2019; Tide International (USA), Inc. answer now due 8/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd.; Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd.; Tide International (USA), Inc..(Attorney Richard DeBodo added to party Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard DeBodo added to party Tide International (USA), Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard DeBodo added to party Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd.(pty:dft))(DeBodo, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc., upon Defendant Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Essy Nabavian, Controller, authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Willingham, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc., upon Defendant Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Essy Nabavian, Controller, authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Willingham, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc., upon Defendant Tide International (USA), Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Essy Nabavian, Controller, authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Willingham, David)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING #16 Non-Resident Attorney Parmanand K. Sharma APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating David K. Willingham as local counsel. (lt)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Rajeev Gupta APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of UPL NA, Inc, designating David K Willingham as local counsel. (lom)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rajeev Gupta to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23979564) filed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Willingham, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Parmanand K. Sharma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23979499) filed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Willingham, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney RAJEEV GUPTA. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney PARMANAND K. SHARMA. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd., Tide International (USA), Inc., and Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Tide, #2 Zhejiang) (jtil)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Withdrawal of Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by UPL NA, Inc.. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc. identifying UPL, Ltd., a publicly traded company as Corporate Parent. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff UPL NA, Inc., (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Hu, Zi Wei)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23931630 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff UPL NA, Inc.. (Attorney Zi Wei Hu added to party UPL NA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hu, Zi Wei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPL NA, Inc. v. Tide International (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhejiang Tide CropScience, Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Jennifer J McGrath
Represented By: Richard DeBodo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Tide Imp. & Exp. Co., LTd.
Represented By: Jennifer J McGrath
Represented By: Richard DeBodo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tide International (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer J McGrath
Represented By: Richard DeBodo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPL NA, Inc.
Represented By: Zi Wei Hu
Represented By: Parmanand K Sharma
Represented By: Maximilienne Giannelli
Represented By: David Karl Willingham
Represented By: Jeanne A Fugate
Represented By: Rajeev Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?