Will Kaupelis et al v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frank Ortega and Will Kaupelis
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01203
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(f) [Corrected] filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT (Joint Rule 26(f) Report) filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: re Stipulation for Protective Order #16 . (sbou)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Joel)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION (1) SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) VACATING DEADLINES UNDER LOCAL RULE 23-3 #10 by Judge James V. Selna. 1. Plaintiff's time to file an opposition to Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss is August 19, 2019; 2. Defendant's time to file a reply brief in support of its anticipated motion to dismiss is September 6, 2019; 3. The hearing on Defendants motion will be set for September 16, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. 4. The deadline to file a motion for class certification pursuant to Local Rule 23-3 is vacated. The parties shall meet and confer and propose a briefing schedule in connection with the initial case management conference. (es)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of 12(b) Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Herling, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendant's 12(b) Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint) (Herling, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc., (Herling, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel J Herling on behalf of Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (Attorney Daniel J Herling added to party Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Herling, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Hearing re Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Joel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/12/2019. (lb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (ghap)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega, (Smith, Joel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Smith, Joel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23933048 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Will Kaupelis, Frank Ortega. (Attorney Joel D Smith added to party Will Kaupelis(pty:pla), Attorney Joel D Smith added to party Frank Ortega(pty:pla))(Smith, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Will Kaupelis et al v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ortega
Represented By: Joel D Smith
Represented By: Blair Elizabeth Reed
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Kaupelis
Represented By: Joel D Smith
Represented By: Blair Elizabeth Reed
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Herling
Represented By: Samantha Joyce Duplantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?