Angela Boone v. Interstate Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Boone Angela and Angela Boone
Defendant: Interstate Management Company, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01208
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of The Parties' Initial Conference Under FRCP 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Angela Boone. (Williams, Corbett)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELIEVING PLAINTIFF OF THE REQUIREMENT TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION WITHIN 90 DAYS #11 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiff Angela Boone is relieved of any obligation under Central District of California Local Rule 23-3 to file a motion for class certification within 90 days. (iv)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on August 15, 2019. (gga)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Order RELIEVING PLAINTIFF OF THE REQUIREMENT TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION WITHIN 90 DAYS filed by Plaintiff Angela Boone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Corbett)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01208 CJC(SSx). (rn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Angela Boone.. (Williams, Corbett)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angela Boone, identifying Angela Boone, Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Williams, Corbett)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Interstate Management Company, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on June 18, 2019. (Bodaghi, Pejmon)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Interstate Management Company, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT I)(ghap)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Interstate Management Company, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by plaintiff Angela Boone. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT F)(ghap)
June 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Interstate Management Company, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Angela Boone. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Interstate Management Company, LLC identifying Interstate Operating Company, L.P. as Corporate Parent. (Bodaghi, Pejmon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Interstate Management Company, LLC, identifying Angela Boone; Interstate Management Company, LLC; Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc.; Interstate Operating Company, L.P.; Northridge Holdings, Inc.. (Bodaghi, Pejmon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Bodaghi, Pejmon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Bodaghi, Pejmon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2019-01066745 Receipt No: 0973-23935659 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Interstate Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of J. Johnson ISO Removal, #2 Declaration Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex A to Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #4 Exhibit Ex B Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #5 Exhibit Ex C Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #6 Exhibit Ex D Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #7 Exhibit Ex E Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #8 Exhibit Ex F Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #9 Exhibit Ex G Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #10 Exhibit Ex H Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal, #11 Exhibit Ex I Dec of J. Hart ISO Removal) (Attorney Pejmon Dustin Bodaghi added to party Interstate Management Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Bodaghi, Pejmon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela Boone v. Interstate Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boone Angela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Boone
Represented By: Corbett H Williams
Represented By: James B Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Pejmon Dustin Bodaghi
Represented By: James E Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?