United States of America v. Media Mix 365, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Nicole J. Long, Nicolas Long, Media Mix 365, LLC, Nicole Leonard and Nicole Leonard-Long
Case Number: 8:2019cv01243
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. MD JS-6. Case Terminated (twdb) Modified on 7/8/2019 (twdb).
June 23, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Baron, Rachel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION for Order Permanent Injunction and Civil Penalty filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baron, Rachel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attorney Rachel Baron added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Baron, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Media Mix 365, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole J. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Media Mix 365, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Leonard-Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara Y K Chun
Represented By: Rachel Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?