Nicholas Hatsiandrou v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hatsiandrou
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv01265
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by Defendant United States of Americato Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #1 (Waier, Jennifer)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE (In Chambers) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court orders the Government to file its response to the motion on or before 8/23/2019. Petitioner shall file any reply to the Governments response on or before 9/23/2019. Upon the filing of Petitioners reply, this matter will stand submitted. (jp)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Letter filed by Defendant Nicholas Hatsiandrou re Correspondence dated 6/24/2019 re Motion #1 . (jp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (jp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Reduction of Sentence Pursuant to 18 USC 3582(c)(1)(A)(i). (FILED AS MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255) assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 8:13-cr-00090-JLS, filed by plaintiff Nicholas Hatsiandrou. (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas Hatsiandrou v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hatsiandrou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney SA-CR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?