Kelly M. Wolfe v. Molly Hill
Petitioner: Kelly M. Wolfe
Respondent: Molly Hill
Case Number: 8:2019cv01312
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Jennifer A. Jadovitz on behalf of Respondent Molly Hill. (Attorney Jennifer A Jadovitz added to party Molly Hill(pty:res))(Jadovitz, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. that Respondent Molly Hill file Answer to the Petition not later than 9/13/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities) (ec)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (et)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Kelly M. Wolfe. The Petitioner does not consent. (et)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of Petition #1 filed by Petitioner Kelly M. Wolfe. (et)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Filing fee $ 5 PAID.), filed by Petitioner Kelly M. Wolfe. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly M. Wolfe v. Molly Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelly M. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Molly Hill
Represented By: Jennifer A Jadovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?