Jose A. Jimenez v. Warden
Petitioner: Jose A. Jimenez
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 8:2019cv01321
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS / STRATTON NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Attorney General filed a motion to dismiss this habeas action. (Docket #8 .) The Attorney General contends that Petitioner's current action is untimely, unexhausted, and does not raise a cognizable claim on federal habeas review. Petitioner's response to the motion will be due by or before October 4. (See Order for Further Details) (kl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #8 (Attachments: #1 Lodgment 1)(Delgado-Rucci, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Warden. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and Memorandum in Support Thereof) (Delgado-Rucci, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Delgado-Rucci on behalf of Respondent Warden (Attorney David Delgado-Rucci added to party Warden(pty:res))(Delgado-Rucci, David)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Attorney Generals response (answer or dismissal motion) will be due by September 13. After the Court reviews the Attorney Generals submission, it will provide Petitioner with a reasonable deadline for his optional reply submission (Attorney General answers petition) or mandatory motion opposition (Attorney General moves to dismiss case). (See Minute Order for further details) re: Statement #5 . (vm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT Re: Motion for Reconsideration due to a misapplication of law and rule filed by Petitioner Jose A. Jimenez. (vm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: SCREENING OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court ORDERS Petitioner to file either: (a) a written statement (not to exceed 5 pages excluding attachments) that satisfies the criteria set forth above; or (b) a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of the action. Petitioner shall file either document with the Court by August 9, 2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (See Minute Order for further details) (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Notice of Dismissal Form) (vm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93) filed by petitioner Jose A. Jimenez. (esa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Jose A. Jimenez. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose A. Jimenez v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose A. Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: David Delgado-Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?