State Farm General Insurance Company v. Jakel Motors Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, Inclusive, Jakel Motors Incorporated and Broan-Nutone LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01330
Filed: July 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court sets the case management dates with the agreement of counsel as follows: Jury Trial September 8, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference August 24, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off March 30, 2020. Expert Discovery Cut-off July 2, 2020. Law and Motion Cut-off July 20, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Last Day to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties October 15, 2019. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than April 30, 2020. (See document for further details) Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company.. (Korinko, Jeffery)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffery Alan Korinko counsel for Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company. Adding Jeffery A. Korinko, Esq. as counsel of record for State Farm General Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company. (Korinko, Jeffery)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 filed by Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company (Korinko, Jeffery)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company identifying State Farm General Insurance Company as Corporate Parent. (Korinko, Jeffery)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Appearance of Counsel (Korinko, Jeffery)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/19 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 8/19/19. (lb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Broan-Nutone LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
July 7, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Broan-Nutone LLC, Does 1 to 20, Jakel Motors Incorporated. Filed by Plaintiff State Farm General Insurance Company. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/03/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-2 #1 ) (lh)
July 7, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendants Broan-Nutone LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/04/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3)(lh)
July 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE filed by Defendants Broan-Nutone LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. re: Defendants Filing of Answer in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mijanovic, Krsto)
July 7, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Broan-Nutone LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated.. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
July 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Broan-Nutone LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
July 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01061808-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24040565 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Broan-Nutone LLC, Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Attorney Krsto Mijanovic added to party Broan-Nutone LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Krsto Mijanovic added to party Jakel Motors Incorporated(pty:dft))(Mijanovic, Krsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm General Insurance Company v. Jakel Motors Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jakel Motors Incorporated
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Represented By: Theo Giovanni Arbucci
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffery Alan Korinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?