Irma Budde v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Irma Budde
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 8:2019cv01331
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Irma Budde. upon Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Sean P. Nalty, Esq.. (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (jp)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Irma Budde. (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Irma Budde, (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Irma Budde. (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Irma Budde. (Gavidia, Cesar)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24040979 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Irma Budde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disability policy) (Attorney Cesar Gavidia added to party Irma Budde(pty:pla))(Gavidia, Cesar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irma Budde v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Budde
Represented By: Cesar Gavidia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?