Health Net Life Insurance Company v. ABC Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Health Net Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Raymond Yates, Morningside Recovery, LLC, ABC Services Group, Inc. and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01342
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 44 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court. (twdb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS #20 , AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #19 . For the reasons set forth above, the Court REMANDS this action to the Superior Court of California, County of Orange, and DENIES Plaintiffs request for attorneys fees and costs. As the case is now remanded, the Court also DENIES AS MOOT Defendants Motion to Dismiss. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter. The Court resets all pending motions to 11/18/19 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel waive oral argument. The Court takes the motions UNDER SUBMISSION. Case number SA CV 19-0243-DOC (DFMx) shall be consolidated with case numbers SA CV 19-0317-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0530-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0677-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0776-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0777-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0789-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0803-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-0804-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-1000-DOC (DFMx), SA CV 19-1011-DOC (DFMx). Case number SA CV 19-1342- DOC (DFMx) shall not be consolidated. Fact Discovery cut-off 6/1/2020. Motions due by 8/3/2020 at 8:30 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Bench Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John M LeBlanc counsel for Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company. Adding Samuel A. Canales as counsel of record for Health Net Life Insurance Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company. (LeBlanc, John)
October 17, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from T. Mark Tubis to Craig B. Garner. filed by Defendants Morningside Recovery, LLC and ABC Services Group, Inc. ABC Services Group, Inc., DOES, Morningside Recovery, LLC, (Garner, Craig)
October 17, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Franklin Joseph Contreras, Jr counsel for Defendant Raymond Yates. Changing firm name to Shulman Bastian LLP. Changing email to fcontreras@shulmanbastian.com. Filed by Defendant Raymond Yates. (Contreras, Franklin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 38 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 Notice of Joinder in Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Reply Declaration of Craig B. Garner in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Raymond Yates. (Contreras, Franklin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., DOES, Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Garner, Craig)
October 4, 2019 Filing 36 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 14 days, filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company.. (Hernandez, Ileana)
October 4, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY supporting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Hernandez, Ileana)
September 27, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Craig B. Garner Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., DOES, Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Garner, Craig)
September 19, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig B Garner counsel for Defendant ABC Services Group, Inc.. Adding Penelope M. Deihl as counsel of record for ABC Services Group, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCES AND PENDING MOTIONS TO OCTOBER 18, 2019 AT 8:30 AM AND SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 18, AT 8:30 AM. The Scheduling Conferences and any pending motions in the above cases will be reset to October 18, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. The Court sets a Status Conference for SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) for October 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Court requests the presence of Robert OBrien as Special Master in SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) ABC Services Group, Inc. v United Healthcare Services, et al. (twdb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 31 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 Notice of Joinder in Morningside Recovery, LLC's and ABC Services Group, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Defendant Raymond Yates. (Contreras, Franklin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., DOES, Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Garner, Craig)
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #19 filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ileana M. Hernandez in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Hernandez, Ileana)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #25 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Advance the Hearing on its Motion to Remand and for Attorneys' fees and costs. DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT. (twdb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE Notice of Joinder in Opposition filed by Defendant Raymond Yates. Defendant, Raymond Yates' Notice of Joinder in Defendants, Morningside Recovery LLC's and ABC Services Group, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing on Motion to Remand (Contreras, Franklin)
August 6, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company's Notice of Ex Parte Application and Ex Parte Application #25 filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., DOES, Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Garner, Craig)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #20 Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company's Notice of Ex Parte Application and Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing on its Motion to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig S. Bloomgarden, #2 Proposed Order) (Bloomgarden, Craig)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE Notice of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Raymond Yates. Yates' Notice of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss brought by Morningside Recovery, LLC and ABC Services Group (Contreras, Franklin)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: RESCHEDULING SCHEDULING CONFERENCES AND PENDING MOTIONS TO OCTOBER 7, 2019 AT 8:30 AM AND SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE FOR OCTOBER 7, AT 8:30 AM. The Scheduling Conferences and any pending motions in the above cases will be reset to 10/7/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets a Status Conference for SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) for October 7, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The Court requests the presence of Robert OBrien as Special Master in SA CV 19-0531-DOC (DFMx) ABC Services Group, Inc. v United Healthcare Services, et al. (twdb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company identifying Centene Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Bloomgarden, Craig)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company, (Bloomgarden, Craig)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig S. Bloomgarden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Bloomgarden, Craig)
July 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., DOES, Morningside Recovery, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Declaration of Craig B. Garner, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Garner, Craig)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 13, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Not More than 30 Days as to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Morningside Recovery, LLC and ABC Services Group, Inc. ABC Services Group, Inc..(Garner, Craig)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE NOTICE OF INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER filed by Defendants Morningside and ABC ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE Notice of Joinder in Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Raymond Yates. (Contreras, Franklin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 [NOTICE OF JOINDER FILED AS] NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01077510 Receipt No: 0973-24061834 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Raymond Yates. (Attorney Franklin Joseph Contreras, Jr added to party Raymond Yates(pty:dft))(Contreras, Franklin) Modified on 7/11/2019 (twdb).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00243 DOC(DFMx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01342 DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig B Garner counsel for Defendant ABC Services Group, Inc.. Adding Rochelle J. Bioteau as counsel of record for Defendants Morningside Recovery, LLC and ABC Services Group, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Morningside Recovery, LLC and ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Morningside and ABC ABC Services Group, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on July 10, 2019. (Garner, Craig)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., Morningside Recovery, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00243-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-01011-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-01000-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-00776-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-00777-DOC-DFM 8:19-cv-00317-DOC-DFM 8:19-cv-00789-DOC-DFM 8:19-cv-00677-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-00530-DOC-DFM 8:19-cv-00531-DOC-DFM, 8:19-cv-00803-DOC-DFM and 8:19-cv-00804-DOC-DFM (Garner, Craig)
July 8, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Health Net Life Insurance Company in Orange County Superior Court on 6/17/2019, attached to Notice of Removal. (jtil)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Garner, Craig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., Morningside Recovery, LLC, (Attorney Craig B Garner added to party Morningside Recovery, LLC(pty:dft))(Garner, Craig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., Morningside Recovery, LLC. Re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Garner, Craig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Craig B. Garner re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc., Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Garner, Craig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court, County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01077510-CU-BT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24048058 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 complaint, #3 notice of related case, #4 notice of assignment, #5 notice of reassignment) (Attorney Craig B Garner added to party ABC Services Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Garner, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Net Life Insurance Company v. ABC Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Yates
Represented By: Leonard M Shulman
Represented By: Franklin Joseph Contreras, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morningside Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Craig B Garner
Represented By: Rochelle J Bioteau
Represented By: Tal Mark Tubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Craig B Garner
Represented By: Rochelle J Bioteau
Represented By: Penelope M Deihl
Represented By: Tal Mark Tubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Net Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory N Pimstone
Represented By: John M LeBlanc
Represented By: Craig S Bloomgarden
Represented By: Ileana M Hernandez
Represented By: Samuel Alonso Canales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?