Paul Anthony Stewart v. Michael Sexton
Petitioner: Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr.
Respondent: Michael Sexton
Case Number: 8:2019cv01343
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice (Other), #13 (Attachments: #1 Lodgment No. 1, #2 Lodgment No. 2, #3 Lodgment No. 3, #4 Lodgment No. 4, #5 Lodgment No. 5, #6 Lodgment No. 6, #7 Lodgment No. 7, #8 Lodgment No. 8, #9 Lodgment No. 9, #10 Lodgment No. 10, #11 Lodgment No. 11, #12 Lodgment No. 12)(Jadovitz, Jennifer)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by respondent Michael Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Jadovitz, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by respondent Michael Sexton. (Jadovitz, Jennifer)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Respondent Michael Sexton file Answer to the Petition not later than 9/13/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit) (dml)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) #7 . Incorrect response was given. Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt No. 1) is not to be STRICKEN and considered filed, along with the requested Corrected (signed) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on 7/24/2019. (dml)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Petitioner Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Parker, Corey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 CORRECTED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (28 USC 2254), with filing fee previously paid ($5.00 paid on 07/09/2019, receipt number 0973-24049559), filed by Petitioner Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr.(Parker, Corey) Modified on 7/24/2019 (dml).
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening #6 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or CORRECTED document as soon as practicable. Please address all of the issues listed on NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES, Dkt #6 : (1) The Petition is not sign by attorney on page 8, (2) The CV-69 form does not have a check Yes or No and not dated or sign by attorney on page 9 (3) The CV-69 document should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. (hr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The followings (1) The Petition is not sign by attorney on page 8, (2) The CV-69 form does not have a check Yes or No and not dated or sign by attorney on page 9 (3) The CV-69 document should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Memorandum is attached to the Petition. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to hold case in abeyance pending Exhaustion of State Remedies filed by Petitioner Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr. (Parker, Corey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr. (Parker, Corey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (28 USC 2254), Receipt No. 0973-24049559 for $5 filing fee, filed by Petitioner Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Corey Evan Parker added to party Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr(pty:pet))(Parker, Corey) Modified on 7/24/2019 (hr). Modified on 7/25/2019 (dml).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Anthony Stewart v. Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Anthony Stewart, Jr.
Represented By: Corey Evan Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?