Donald R. Pierce v. Dean Borders
Petitioner: Donald R Pierce
Respondent: Dean Borders
Case Number: 8:2019cv01352
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Debra Wallace re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #10 filed by Respondent Dean Borders. (Danzig, Douglas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Douglas P Danzig counsel for Respondent Dean Borders. Adding Douglas P. Danzig as counsel of record for Dean Borders, Warden for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent Dean Borders, Warden. (Attorney Douglas P Danzig added to party Dean Borders(pty:res))(Danzig, Douglas)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Attorney Generals response be it an answer to the petition or a dismissal motion will be due within 30 days. (See Minute Order for further details) re: Statement #8 . (vm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT filed by Petitioner Donald R Pierce. (vm)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: SCREENING OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.Petitioner will respond to this order by August 9. (See Minute Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Transfer order, #3 Docket) (vm)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The request is GRANTED. re: #2 . (vm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Christina A. Snyder and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38) (jtil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to District of United States District Court for the Central District of California, Southern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of United States District Court for the Central District of California, Southern Division*. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 7/12/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald R. Pierce. (jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 7/12/2019.] Modified on 7/12/2019 (jtil).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Dean Borders, filed by Donald R. Pierce.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1221-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(jms) [Transferred from California Southern on 7/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald R. Pierce v. Dean Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald R Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Borders
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas P Danzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?