Vampire Family Brands, LLC v. Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vampire Family Brands, LLC
Defendant: Yum Brands Inc and Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01388
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Yum Brands Inc answer now due 9/23/2019; Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC answer now due 9/23/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Yum Brands Inc; Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC.(Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Yum Brands Inc(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Sean)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Vampire Family Brands, LLC. (Machat, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC, Yum Brands Inc. (esa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Vampire Family Brands, LLC. (Machat, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vampire Family Brands, LLC, (Machat, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Vampire Family Brands, LLC. (Machat, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24095325 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Vampire Family Brands, LLC. (Attorney Michael Machat added to party Vampire Family Brands, LLC(pty:pla))(Machat, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vampire Family Brands, LLC v. Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yum Brands Inc
Represented By: Sean M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell IP Holder, LLC
Represented By: Sean M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vampire Family Brands, LLC
Represented By: Michael Machat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?