Shamim Darchini et al v. Michael R. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: A. S.(2), KEYVAN PARSA, ARASH RAFII SERESHKI, SAMIRA BAYRAMZADEH, R. R., MAHSA MOUSAEI, JOHN DOE, N. F., ANAHITA MEHRANI, FARZAN NEMATOLLAH, SIAVASH KOOHMARAIE, KIYOUMARS KAVOOSIAN, H. R., MOZHDEH HAFEZIBAKHTIARI, AMIN SIRATI, SHIMA MONTAKHABI, DJALAL EBRAHIMNEJAD, MANIJEH JAVDAN, BIJAN SERESHKI, JANE DOE, ASHKAN KESHTMAND, BATOUL DEHGHAN KHATRAMI, MEHRNAZ RASSI, NAVID ABDOULLAHZADEH, MANSOUR HARDANIAN, SHAMIM DARCHINI, FATEMEH KARIMI ALAMDARI, A. R., TAHEREH FEREYDOUNI, S. R., ELAHEH ALIKHAN ZADEH, PARTO KAVOOSIAN, MASOUD ABDI, BEHNAZ KAVOOSIAN, SEYEDEHNAZANIN MIREMARATI, FARSHAD AMIRKHANI, A. S.(1) and Bijan Rafii Sereshki
Defendant: DEAN M. KAPLAN, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, ERIN R. HOFFMAN, DANIEL E. MICKELSON, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Does 3-10, JOEL D. NANTAIS and Does No. 3 - No. 10, in their official capacity as consular and other officials employed by the U.S. Department of State
Case Number: 8:2019cv01417
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to PLAINTIFFS Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati for Court Reporter. Court will contact CURTIS LEE MORRISON at CURTIS@CURTISMORRISONLAW.COM with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Morrison, Curtis)
September 13, 2019 Filing 39 OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions as to All Defendants and their Counsel of Record #36 filed by Defendants Does, Erin R. Hoffman, Dean M. Kaplan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Daniel E. Mickelson, Joel D. Nantais, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email between Joseph Darrow and Curtis Morrison)(Darrow, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 38 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to file Supplemental Evidence in Support of Pl. Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Curtis)
September 10, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions as to All Defendants and their Counsel of Record #36 filed by Plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Morrison, Curtis)
September 9, 2019 Filing 36 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions as to All Defendants and their Counsel of Record filed by plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Morrison, Curtis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Adjudication of PP 9645(3)(C) waivers that have been unreasonably delayed by Defendants. Motion #8 Notice of Filing Supplemental Declaration of Chloe Dybdahl filed by Defendants Does, Erin R. Hoffman, Dean M. Kaplan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Daniel E. Mickelson, Joel D. Nantais, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Chloe Dybdahl)(Darrow, Joseph)
August 30, 2019 Filing 34 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Adjudication of PP 9645(3)(C) waivers that have been unreasonably delayed #8 previously set for 9/9/2019 at 1:30 pm is continued to 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Production of Administrative Records by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED. (See document for details.) re #16 (sbou)
August 27, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTES OF Motion to Expedite Production of Administrative Records #16 held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Case called. Counsel make their appearances. Counsel argue motion. Court takes matter under submission. Court Recorder: CS 08/27/19. (sbou)
August 26, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Adjudication of PP 9645(3)(C) waivers that have been unreasonably delayed by Defendants. Motion #8 filed by Plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Morrison, Curtis)
August 22, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Expedite Production of Administrative Records #16 filed by Plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. (Morrison, Curtis)
August 19, 2019 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff A. S.(2), Farshad Amirkhani, Jane Doe, Farzan Nematollah, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Amin Sirati, A. R., Shamim Darchini, Manijeh Javdan, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, H. R., Shima Montakhabi, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Siavash Koohmaraie, R. R., John Doe, Masoud Abdi, Tahereh Fereydouni, A. S.(1), Mahsa Mousaei, Mehrnaz Rassi, Mansour Hardanian, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Anahita Mehrani, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Arash Rafii Sereshki, Ashkan Keshtmand, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, S. R., Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, N. F., Keyvan Parsa, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Samira Bayramzadeh, Behnaz Kavoosian, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to F. Dela Rosa, for U.S. Attorney's Office. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morrison, Curtis)
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Adjudication of PP 9645(3)(C) waivers that have been unreasonably delayed by Defendants. Motion #8 filed by Defendants Does, Erin R. Hoffman, Dean M. Kaplan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Daniel E. Mickelson, Joel D. Nantais, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Chloe Dybdahl)(Darrow, Joseph)
August 16, 2019 Filing 27 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Expedite Production of Administrative Records #16 filed by Defendants Does, Erin R. Hoffman, Dean M. Kaplan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Daniel E. Mickelson, Joel D. Nantais, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of Chloe Dybdahl)(Darrow, Joseph)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #18 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing PARTO KAVOOSIAN as Guardian ad Litem for N.F. (sbou)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #20 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing FATEMEH KARIMI ALAMDARI as Guardian ad Litem for S.A.(1) and S.A.(2). (sbou)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: granting #19 PETITION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Appointing MEHRNAZ RASSI as Guardian ad Litem for R.R., S.R., H.R., and A.R. (sbou) Modified on 8/12/2019 (sbou).
August 8, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTES OF Telephone Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Case called. Counsel make their appearances. Court and counsel confer regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Production of Administrative Records #16 . The Court sets the following briefing schedule: Opposition to Motion due 8/16/2019; Reply due 8/23/2019 and Hearing on Motion 8/27/2019, at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: CS 08/08/2019. (et)
August 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: PETITION for Appointment of Parto Kavoosian as Guardian ad Litem for N.F. #18 , PETITION for Appointment of Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari as Guardian ad Litem for S.A.(1) and S.A.(2) #20 , PETITION for Appointment of Mehrnaz Rassi as Guardian ad Litem for R.R., S.R., H.R., and A.R. #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Anton Darrow counsel for Defendants Does, Erin R. Hoffman, Dean M. Kaplan, Kevin K. McAleenan, Daniel E. Mickelson, Joel D. Nantais, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. Adding Joseph Anton Darrow as counsel of record for Defendants Michael R. Pompeo; Joel D. Nantias; Erin R. Hoffman; Dean M. Kaplan; Daniel E. Mickelson; U.S. Department of State; Kevin K. McAleenan; U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Does 3-10 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Michael R. Pompeo; Joel D. Nantias; Erin R. Hoffman; Dean M. Kaplan; Daniel E. Mickelson; U.S. Department of State; Kevin K. McAleenan; U.S. Department of Homeland Security; Does 3-10. (Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party Erin R. Hoffman (pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party Dean M. Kaplan(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party Daniel E. Mickelson(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party Joel D. Nantais(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party Michael R. Pompeo(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Anton Darrow added to party U.S. Department of State(pty:dft))(Darrow, Joseph)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 PETITION for Appointment of Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari as Guardian ad Litem for S.A.(1) and S.A.(2) filed by plaintiffs A. S.(1), A. S.(2). (Morrison, Curtis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 PETITION for Appointment of Mehrnaz Rassi as Guardian ad Litem for R.R., S.R., H.R., and A.R. filed by plaintiffs A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R.. (Morrison, Curtis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 PETITION for Appointment of Parto Kavoosian as Guardian ad Litem for N.F. filed by plaintiff N. F.. (Morrison, Curtis)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Expedite Production of Administrative Records #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sbou)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Expedite Production of Administrative Records filed by plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Curtis)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Erin R. Hoffman, Dean M. Kaplan, Daniel E. Mickelson, Joel D. Nantais, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State. (es)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #12 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Morrison, Curtis)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER #6 by Judge James V. Selna. After consideration of the briefs and arguments of counsel, the evidence filed in support of and opposition to MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF, and being fully advised, the Court: GRANTS THE MOTION. (es)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: After consideration of the briefs and arguments of counsel, the evidence filed in support of and opposition to APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE TO UNDER SEAL, and being fully advised, the Court: GRANTS THE MOTION. #7 (es)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment #1, #2 Attachment #2)(Morrison, Curtis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #9 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
July 28, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment #1, #2 Supplement Attachment #2)(Morrison, Curtis)
July 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Adjudication of PP 9645(3)(C) waivers that have been unreasonably delayed by Defendants. Motion filed by plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV, #51 Exhibit WW, #52 Exhibit XX, #53 Exhibit YY, #54 Exhibit ZZ, #55 Exhibit AAA, #56 Exhibit BBB, #57 Exhibit CCC, #58 Exhibit DDD, #59 Exhibit EEE, #60 Exhibit FFF, #61 Exhibit GGG, #62 Exhibit HHH, #63 Exhibit III, #64 Exhibit JJJ, #65 Exhibit KKK, #66 Exhibit LLL, #67 Exhibit MMM, #68 Exhibit NNN, #69 Exhibit OOO, #70 Exhibit PPP, #71 Exhibit QQQ, #72 Exhibit RRR, #73 Exhibit SSS, #74 Exhibit TTT, #75 Exhibit UUU, #76 Exhibit VVV, #77 Exhibit WWW, #78 Exhibit XXX, #79 Exhibit YYY, #80 Exhibit ZZZ, #81 Exhibit AAAA, #82 Exhibit BBBB, #83 Exhibit CCCC, #84 Exhibit DDDD, #85 Exhibit EEEE, #86 Exhibit FFFF, #87 Exhibit GGGG, #88 Exhibit HHHH, #89 Exhibit IIII, #90 Exhibit JJJJ, #91 Exhibit KKKK, #92 Exhibit LLLL, #93 Exhibit MMMM, #94 Exhibit NNNN, #95 Exhibit OOOO, #96 Exhibit PPPP, #97 Exhibit QQQQ, #98 Exhibit RRRR, #99 Exhibit SSSS, #100 Exhibit TTTT, #101 Exhibit UUUU, #102 Exhibit VVVVV, #103 Exhibit WWWW) (Morrison, Curtis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A, B, and C (to MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF) under seal filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Unredacted Document, #3 Unredacted Document, #4 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Curtis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Curtis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Morrison, Curtis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Masoud Abdi, Navid Abdoullahzadeh, Elaheh Alikhan Zadeh, Farshad Amirkhani, Samira Bayramzadeh, Shamim Darchini, Batoul Dehghan Khatrami, Djalal Ebrahimnejad, N. F., Tahereh Fereydouni, Mozhdeh Hafezibakhtiari, Mansour Hardanian, Jane Doe, Manijeh Javdan, John Doe, Fatemeh Karimi Alamdari, Behnaz Kavoosian, Kiyoumars Kavoosian, Parto Kavoosian, Ashkan Keshtmand, Siavash Koohmaraie, Anahita Mehrani, Seyedehnazanin Miremarati, Shima Montakhabi, Mahsa Mousaei, Farzan Nematollah, Keyvan Parsa, A. R., H. R., R. R., S. R., Arash Rafii Sereshki, Bijan Rafii Sereshki, Mehrnaz Rassi, A. S.(1), A. S.(2), Amin Sirati. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Morrison, Curtis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): It appears a guardian ad litem is named in this case but no Petition seeking such appointment has been filed. A Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem must be filed when the appointment of a guardian ad litem is required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)(2). See Local Rule 171. Counsel must file a Petition for the Appointment of a Guardian Ad Litem immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 837. 17. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24128735 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs A. S.(2), FARSHAD AMIRKHANI, JANE DOE, FARZAN NEMATOLLAH, NAVID ABDOULLAHZADEH, AMIN SIRATI, A. R., SHAMIM DARCHINI, MANIJEH JAVDAN, FATEMEH KARIMI ALAMDARI, H. R., SHIMA MONTAKHABI, MOZHDEH HAFEZIBAKHTIARI, SIAVASH KOOHMARAIE, R. R., JOHN DOE, MASOUD ABDI, TAHEREH FEREYDOUNI, A. S.(1), MAHSA MOUSAEI, MEHRNAZ RASSI, MANSOUR HARDANIAN, BATOUL DEHGHAN KHATRAMI, ELAHEH ALIKHAN ZADEH, ANAHITA MEHRANI, KIYOUMARS KAVOOSIAN, PARTO KAVOOSIAN, ARASH RAFII SERESHKI, ASHKAN KESHTMAND, DJALAL EBRAHIMNEJAD, S. R., SEYEDEHNAZANIN MIREMARATI, N. F., KEYVAN PARSA, BIJAN SERESHKI, SAMIRA BAYRAMZADEH, BEHNAZ KAVOOSIAN. (Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MASOUD ABDI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party NAVID ABDOULLAHZADEH(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ELAHEH ALIKHAN ZADEH(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FARSHAD AMIRKHANI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SAMIRA BAYRAMZADEH(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SHAMIM DARCHINI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party BATOUL DEHGHAN KHATRAMI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party JANE DOE(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party JOHN DOE(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party DJALAL EBRAHIMNEJAD(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party N. F.(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party TAHEREH FEREYDOUNI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MOZHDEH HAFEZIBAKHTIARI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MANSOUR HARDANIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MANIJEH JAVDAN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FATEMEH KARIMI ALAMDARI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party BEHNAZ KAVOOSIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party KIYOUMARS KAVOOSIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party PARTO KAVOOSIAN(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ASHKAN KESHTMAND(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SIAVASH KOOHMARAIE(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ANAHITA MEHRANI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SEYEDEHNAZANIN MIREMARATI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party SHIMA MONTAKHABI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MAHSA MOUSAEI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party FARZAN NEMATOLLAH(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party KEYVAN PARSA(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party A. R.(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party H. R.(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party R. R.(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party S. R.(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party ARASH RAFII SERESHKI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party MEHRNAZ RASSI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party A. S.(1)(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party A. S.(2)(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party BIJAN SERESHKI(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party AMIN SIRATI(pty:pla))(Morrison, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamim Darchini et al v. Michael R. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.(2)
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYVAN PARSA
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARASH RAFII SERESHKI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMIRA BAYRAMZADEH
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. R.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHSA MOUSAEI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. F.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAHITA MEHRANI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARZAN NEMATOLLAH
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIAVASH KOOHMARAIE
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIYOUMARS KAVOOSIAN
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. R.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOZHDEH HAFEZIBAKHTIARI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMIN SIRATI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIMA MONTAKHABI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DJALAL EBRAHIMNEJAD
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANIJEH JAVDAN
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIJAN SERESHKI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHKAN KESHTMAND
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BATOUL DEHGHAN KHATRAMI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEHRNAZ RASSI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAVID ABDOULLAHZADEH
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANSOUR HARDANIAN
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAMIM DARCHINI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATEMEH KARIMI ALAMDARI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. R.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAHEREH FEREYDOUNI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. R.
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELAHEH ALIKHAN ZADEH
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARTO KAVOOSIAN
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASOUD ABDI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEHNAZ KAVOOSIAN
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEYEDEHNAZANIN MIREMARATI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARSHAD AMIRKHANI
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.(1)
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bijan Rafii Sereshki
Represented By: Curtis Lee Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEAN M. KAPLAN
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN R. HOFFMAN
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL E. MICKELSON
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 3-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL D. NANTAIS
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does No. 3 - No. 10, in their official capacity as consular and other officials employed by the U.S. Department of State
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Joseph Anton Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?