Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC v. S and S Fuel, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC
Defendant: Sukhdev Singh, Does 1-10, inclusive, L Inc D Aline Corporation, S and S Fuel, Inc. and Zaal John Haddadin
Cross Defendant: Poppy Bank and Roes
Case Number: 8:2019cv01418
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #27 filed by Cross Defendant Poppy Bank. (Greenberg, Mitchell)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #17 filed by Cross-Defendant Poppy Bank.(Attorney Mitchell B Greenberg added to party Poppy Bank(pty:crd))(Greenberg, Mitchell)
September 16, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #17 filed by Cross-Defendants Zaal John Haddadin, L Inc D Aline Corporation.(Engle, Joshua)
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC.. (Perez, Phillip)
August 29, 2019 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Crossclaim #17 as to Cross Defendants Zaal John Haddadin, L Inc D Aline Corporation, Poppy Bank. (twdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #18 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #17 filed by CROSS CLAIMANTS S and S Fuel, Inc., Sukhdev Singh. (Dominguez, Darin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #18 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #17 filed by CROSS CLAIMANTS S and S Fuel, Inc., Sukhdev Singh. (Dominguez, Darin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request as to Cross Claim #18 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint/cross claim verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is missing the cross claim caption. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The notice of deficiency is INCORRECT re the cross claim and summons request. The cross claim is correct. Disregard #20, 21. Re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents #20 Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons #21 . (twdb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #18 . The following error(s) was found: Unable to issue the summons. Poppy Bank is not a cross defendant as listed in the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Crossclaim, #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: The answer includes a cross claim, a claim brought by one defendant against another in the same proceeding. Poppy Bank is not a defendant in this case. Other error(s) with document(s): Poppy Bank will be removed from the docket. Not a defendant in this case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Cross Claimants S and S Fuel, Inc., Sukhdev Singh, identifying L'Inc D'Aline Corporation, Zaal John Haddadin, Poppy Bank, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Dominguez, Darin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #17 filed by Cross Claimants S and S Fuel, Inc., Sukhdev Singh. (Dominguez, Darin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, First CROSSCLAIM against Zaal John Haddadin, L Inc D Aline Corporation, POPPY BANK filed by Defendant Sukhdev Singh, S and S Fuel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Cross Claim, #2 Exhibit 2 to Cross Claim, #3 Exhibit 3 to Cross Claim)(Dominguez, Darin)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Zaal John Haddadin, L Inc D Aline Corporation.(Attorney Joshua Roy Engle added to party Zaal John Haddadin(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Roy Engle added to party L Inc D Aline Corporation(pty:dft))(Engle, Joshua)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to S and S Fuel, Inc. answer now due 8/26/2019; Sukhdev Singh answer now due 8/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC.(McLaughlin, Nicole)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, upon Defendant Zaal John Haddadin served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sue "Doe", Mother in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (McLaughlin, Nicole)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, upon Defendant L Inc D Aline Corporation served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (McLaughlin, Nicole)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, upon Defendant Sukhdev Singh served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sukhdev Singh in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McLaughlin, Nicole)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, upon Defendant S and S Fuel, Inc. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sukhdev Singh, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McLaughlin, Nicole)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Zaal John Haddadin, L Inc D Aline Corporation, S and S Fuel, Inc., Sukhdev Singh. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (McLaughlin, Nicole)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, identifying Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Western Refining Southwest, Inc., Giant Industries, Inc., Western Refining, Inc., Andeavor LLC, Marathon Petroleum Corporation dba Marathon Petroleum Corporation of Delaware, S&S Fuel, Inc., Sukhdev Singh, Jasdeep Kaur Aulakh, L Inc D Aline Corporation, Zaal John Haddadin. (McLaughlin, Nicole)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (McLaughlin, Nicole)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24134110 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint) (Attorney Nicole Marie McLaughlin added to party Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, a Delaware limited liability company(pty:pla))(McLaughlin, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC v. S and S Fuel, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhdev Singh
Represented By: Darin R Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Inc D Aline Corporation
Represented By: Joshua Roy Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S and S Fuel, Inc.
Represented By: Darin R Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaal John Haddadin
Represented By: Joshua Roy Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Nicole Marie McLaughlin
Represented By: Phillip Allan Trajan Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Poppy Bank
Represented By: Mitchell B Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?