Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. The Copper Door Bar, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Redone Production LLC d/b/a Songs of Redone, Welsh Witch Music, House Of Gaga Publishing LLC, Embassy Music Corporation, -, Buddy Doiwer Publishing, Emi Blackwood Music Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers, Nu Shooz Orchestra LLC, Beechwood Music Corporation, Al Green Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Redone Production LLC and Rondor Music International, Inc.
Defendant: Duk Whan Oh, The Copper Door Bar, Inc. d/b/a The Copper Door and The Copper Door Bar, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01458
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Set Aside Default, #21 by Judge David O. Carter. Default Set Aside #16 . Defendants must file their responsive pleading no later than 10/15/19. (twdb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Duk Whan Oh, The Copper Door Bar, Inc., identifying see Certificate. (Burton, Anthony)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Defendants The Copper Door Bar, Inc. and Duk Whan Oh filed by Defendants Duk Whan Oh, The Copper Door Bar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Attorney Anthony Walter Burton added to party Duk Whan Oh(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Walter Burton added to party The Copper Door Bar, Inc.(pty:dft))(Burton, Anthony)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Text Only Order re Response #19 , Order to Show Cause #18 by Judge David O. Carter: Show Cause Response due by 10/4/2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mori, AnnMarie)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 9/25/2019. (twdb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., re REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant All Defendants #15 served on 9/10/2019. (Mori, AnnMarie)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 [SET ASIDE PER ENTRY #23 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to The Copper Door Bar, Inc. dba The Copper Door, Duk Whan Oh (twdb) Modified on 9/25/2019 (twdb).
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mori, AnnMarie)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 9/9/2019. (twdb)
September 2, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant Duk Whan Oh served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Duk WHan Oh in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie)
September 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., upon Defendant The Copper Door Bar, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mori, AnnMarie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Duk Whan Oh, The Copper Door Bar, Inc.. (twdb)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc., identifying see Certificate and Attachment. (Mori, AnnMarie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Mori, AnnMarie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24174852 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attorney AnnMarie Mori added to party Broadcast Music, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mori, AnnMarie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. The Copper Door Bar, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redone Production LLC d/b/a Songs of Redone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House Of Gaga Publishing LLC
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embassy Music Corporation, -
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buddy Doiwer Publishing
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emi Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC d/b/a Universal Music Careers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nu Shooz Orchestra LLC
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Green Music, Inc.
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O. Smith Music
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redone Production LLC
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: AnnMarie Mori
Represented By: Russell I Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duk Whan Oh
Represented By: Anna Karenina Pedraja Adraneda
Represented By: Nicholas Duane Myers
Represented By: Anthony Walter Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Copper Door Bar, Inc. d/b/a The Copper Door
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Copper Door Bar, Inc.
Represented By: Anna Karenina Pedraja Adraneda
Represented By: Nicholas Duane Myers
Represented By: Anthony Walter Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?