Ancynthina Ho v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Ancynthina Ho
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2019cv01545
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV19-1545 PJW on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Annabelle J Yang added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Yang, Annabelle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ancynthina Ho, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 8/29/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (sbou)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Ancynthina Ho. (Monge, Troy)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh: ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. SEE ORDER. (im)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh #5 (im)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ancynthina Ho. (Monge, Troy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Ancynthina Ho. (Monge, Troy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ancynthina Ho, (Monge, Troy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ancynthina Ho. (Monge, Troy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Ancynthina Ho. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Ancynthina Ho(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ancynthina Ho v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Annabelle J Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancynthina Ho
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?