Ms. Angela Selysse Madrigal v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Angela Selysse Madrigal and Ms. Angela Selysse Madrigal
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 8:2019cv01569
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/23/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to FRANK KAWANO. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Appendix USPS RETURN RECEIPT)(Ewenike, Jimmy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal, re Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120),, #12 served on 09/11/2019. (Ewenike, Jimmy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 9/11/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ewenike, Jimmy)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (ch)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal. (Ewenike, Jimmy)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (see document for details) (hr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the "To:"section of the summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The aforementioned information has been left blank on the summons request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (hr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal. (Ewenike, Jimmy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal. (Ewenike, Jimmy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal, (Ewenike, Jimmy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal. (Ewenike, Jimmy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24261430 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Angela Selysse Madrigal. (Attorney Jimmy Ogbonna Ewenike added to party Angela Selysse Madrigal(pty:pla))(Ewenike, Jimmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ms. Angela Selysse Madrigal v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Selysse Madrigal
Represented By: Jimmy Ogbonna Ewenike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Angela Selysse Madrigal
Represented By: Jimmy Ogbonna Ewenike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?