220 Adams Ranch Road LLC et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC, John D Thomas and John D. Thomas
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 8:2019cv01601
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, #11 , Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA answer or otherwise plead to the complaint is extended to 11/12/2019. No discovery or dispositive motions shall be filed before November 12, 2019 by Judge Josephine L. Staton (pj)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/12/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC, John D. Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Plead)(Epstein, David)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) #9 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. shall respond to the initial complaint by no later than October 11, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA answer now due 9/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Nabeel M Zuberi added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank NA(pty:dft))(Zuberi, Nabeel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (jtil)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC. (Epstein, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC. (Epstein, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC. (Epstein, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24294236 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC. (Attorney David G Epstein added to party 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC(pty:pla))(Epstein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 220 Adams Ranch Road LLC
Represented By: David G Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Thomas
Represented By: David G Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Nabeel M Zuberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?