Score Right Publishing LLC v. National Junior Basketball League et al
Plaintiff: Score Right Publishing LLC
Defendant: National Junior Basketball League, Dennis Murphy, DOEs 1 through 25, inclusive and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 8:2019cv01604
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Score Right Publishing LLC. upon Dennis Murphy waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019; National Junior Basketball League waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Andrea Levenson. (Jafarinejad, Mandana)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Dennis Murphy, National Junior Basketball League. (jp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #2 filed by plaintiff Score Right Publishing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Face Page of the Complaint)(Jafarinejad, Mandana)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Score Right Publishing LLC. (Jafarinejad, Mandana)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Score Right Publishing LLC. (Jafarinejad, Mandana)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Score Right Publishing LLC, (Jafarinejad, Mandana)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Score Right Publishing LLC. (Jafarinejad, Mandana)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24295974 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Score Right Publishing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Attorney Mandana Jafarinejad added to party Score Right Publishing LLC(pty:pla))(Jafarinejad, Mandana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Score Right Publishing LLC v. National Junior Basketball League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Score Right Publishing LLC
Represented By: Mandana Jafarinejad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Junior Basketball League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOEs 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?