Kitsigianis Properties LLC et al v. Stanton Sales Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jim Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC, Christos Bakolas, Vasiliki Bakolas and Konstantina Bakolas
Defendant: Barbara Enlow, Does 1-10, inclusive, Stanton Sales Corporation, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC, Jack Enlow and BP West Coast Products LLC
Not Yet Classified: Matt Borgeson
Case Number: 8:2019cv01662
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days #13 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendants Jack Enlow and Barbara Enlow shall file and serve their response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before 11/22/2019. (jp)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Konstantina Bakolas, Jim Bakolas, Christos Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC, Vasiliki Bakolas, upon Defendant Barbara Enlow served on 10/3/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Enlow, an Individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Macdonald, James)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Konstantina Bakolas, Jim Bakolas, Christos Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC, Vasiliki Bakolas, upon Defendant Jack Enlow served on 10/3/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jack Enlow, an Individual dba Crown Cleaners and Tailors in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Macdonald, James)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jack Enlow answer now due 11/22/2019; Barbara Enlow answer now due 11/22/2019, filed by Defendant Jack Enlow; Barbara Enlow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Attorney Montgomery Cole added to party Barbara Enlow(pty:dft), Attorney Montgomery Cole added to party Jack Enlow(pty:dft))(Cole, Montgomery)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3) #11 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Defendants Tesoro Refining and Marking Company LLC and BP West Coast Products, LLC shall file and serve their response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before 11/15/2019. (jp)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BP West Coast Products LLC answer now due 11/15/2019; Tesoro Refining and marketing Company LLC answer now due 11/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants BP West Coast Products LLC; Tesoro Refining and marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3))(Attorney Thomas J Boer added to party BP West Coast Products LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas J Boer added to party Tesoro Refining and marketing Company LLC(pty:dft))(Boer, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Konstantina Bakolas, Jim Bakolas, Christos Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC, Vasiliki Bakolas, upon Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro c/o - CT Corporation Systems - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Macdonald, James)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Konstantina Bakolas, Jim Bakolas, Christos Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC, Vasiliki Bakolas. upon Tesoro Refining and marketing Company LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Walter Owen Russell, Senior Counsel. (Macdonald, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BP West Coast Products LLC, Estate of Matt Borgeson, Barbara Enlow, Jack Enlow, Stanton Sales Corporation, Tesoro Refining and marketing Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Summons, #2 Summons for Defendant Jack Enlow, #3 Summons for Defendant Barbara Enlow, #4 Summons for Defendant Estate of Matt Borgeson, #5 Summons for Defendant BP West Coast Products, LLC, #6 Summons for Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC) (et)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Christos Bakolas, Jim Bakolas, Konstantina Bakolas, Vasiliki Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment #1 to Summons, #2 Summonses)(Macdonald, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Macdonald, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Christos Bakolas, Jim Bakolas, Konstantina Bakolas, Vasiliki Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC. (Macdonald, James)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24352643 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Konstantina Bakolas, Jim Bakolas, Christos Bakolas, Kitsigianis Properties LLC, Vasiliki Bakolas. (Attorney James C Macdonald added to party Christos Bakolas(pty:pla), Attorney James C Macdonald added to party Jim Bakolas(pty:pla), Attorney James C Macdonald added to party Konstantina Bakolas(pty:pla), Attorney James C Macdonald added to party Vasiliki Bakolas(pty:pla), Attorney James C Macdonald added to party Kitsigianis Properties LLC(pty:pla))(Macdonald, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitsigianis Properties LLC et al v. Stanton Sales Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Matt Borgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Bakolas
Represented By: James C Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kitsigianis Properties LLC
Represented By: James C Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christos Bakolas
Represented By: James C Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasiliki Bakolas
Represented By: James C Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Konstantina Bakolas
Represented By: James C Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Enlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Enlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?