Matthew Verdiglione v. Milliken Business Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Verdiglione
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, Milliken Business Center, LLC and Vitals Realty
Case Number: 8:2019cv01737
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #11 APPLICATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference presently set for November 18, 2019 is CONTINUED to December 16, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (es)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Continue Scheduling Conference) (Cornell, Ross)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, upon Defendant Milliken Business Center, LLC served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Milliken Business Center LLC by Daisy Montenegro, Agent for CT Corp. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cornell, Ross)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/11/2019. (lb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Milliken Business Center, LLC, Vitals Realty. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, (Cornell, Ross)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24423180 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Matthew Verdiglione(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew Verdiglione v. Milliken Business Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Verdiglione
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milliken Business Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitals Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?