Chang Woo v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Chang Woo
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01754
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (EVIDENTIARY) Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Hearing held. Pro se plaintiffs Chang Woo and Doo Ko are not present. For the reasons stated on the record, all matters concerning, but not limited to, previously ordered sanctions, attorneys' fees, possible imprisonment of plaintiffs, dismissal of actions with prejudice are taken under submission. The Court shall issue a further order on Friday, November 15, 2019 Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court has numerous concerns about this case, principally as it relates to other cases that have been filed in this Court. The Court thus SETS a scheduling conference for Tuesday, November 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. At this hearing, the Court also ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions are not appropriate and why this action isn't barred by the following related cases, which the Court dismissed with prejudice on October 25, 2019- four days before this case was filed. (es)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 JUDGMENT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: 1. That this entire action is dismissed with prejudice; and 2. That judgment be entered in favor of defendants U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Caliber Home Loans, Inc. as to each and every claim, and that Plaintiff takes nothing by way of his claims. #23 (es)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: This Court, on October 24, 2019, held a hearing on an Order to Show Cause re: Plaintiff Chang Woo's ("Plaintiff") failure to prosecute and sanctions against Plaintiff, including monetary sanctions and dismissal of action. After the hearing, the Court rules as follows. 1. Sanctions are awarded in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff in the amount of $5,000; 2. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ON THE MERITS; and 3. All other hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are VACATED. (See order for further details.) (es)
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 **AMENDED** MINUTES OF ORDER TO Show Cause Hearing #20 held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Order to Show Cause hearing held. No appearance on behalf of Plaintiff. The Court and counsel for defendant confer regarding matters as stated on the record. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court ORDERS this action DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ON THE MERITS. The Court further orders sanctions against Plaintiff in the amount of $5000. Counsel may lodge a proposed order and proposed judgment for the Court's review. All other hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. In light of the dismissal of this action, the Court further orders the Order to Show Cause #16 issued on October 7, 2019 discharged. (es)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Show Cause Hearing - optional html form,,,, Terminated Case,,, #20 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)(Feng, Simon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES OF ORDER TO Show Cause Hearing held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Order to Show Cause hearing held. No appearance on behalf of Plaintiff. The Court and counsel for defendant confer regarding matters as stated on the record. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court ORDERS this action DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ON THE MERITS. The Court further orders sanctions against Plaintiff in the amount of $500. Counsel may lodge a proposed order and proposed judgment for the Court's review. All other hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. In light of the dismissal of this action, the Court further orders the Order to Show Cause #16 issued on October 7, 2019 discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING EX PARTE APPLICATION ANDORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court thus SETS a hearingon Mr. Ko's ex parte application for tomorrow, October 24, 2019 at 11:00 A.M. Necessarily, the Court must also advance the order to show cause hearing in Chang Woo v. U.S. Bank Trust, NA. et al, SACV 19-01754 AG (DFMx), currently set for November 4, 2019, to tomorrow, October 24, 2019 at 11:00 A.M. Defendants are ORDERED to take all reasonable efforts in notifying Mr. Ko and Mr. Woo of this hearing. (See order for further details.) (es)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #16 filed by Plaintiff Chang Woo. (es)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Amended) Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-01846-AG-DFM, 8:19-cv-01268-AG-DFM, 8:19-cv-01963 (Feng, Simon)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Andrew J. Guilford: No appearances on behalf of Plaintiff. The Court and counsel for Defendant confer regarding matters as stated on the record. In light of the discussion of the Court and Defendant's counsel in addition to the Court's September 24, 2019 Order #12 , the Court sets an Order to Show Cause November 4, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff Chang Woo must appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing in person. (See order for further details) Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (es)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Chang Woo as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (es)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Complaint #13 filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Feng, Simon)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Simon M. Feng, #2 Proposed Order) (Feng, Simon)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER REGARDING THE NATURE OF THIS LAWSUIT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff Chang Woo to appear and testify on October 7, 2019 at 9:00 AM. Defendants U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Caliber Home Loans, Inc., should be prepared to cross-examine Mr. Woo about the nature of this case and related cases. (es)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00642 AG (DFMx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01754 AG (DFMx). Signed by Judge Andrew J. Guilford (esa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #9 served on September 23, 2019. (McClendon, Regina)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(McClendon, Regina)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 served on September 19, 2019. (McClendon, Regina)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
September 16, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by Defendant Chang Woo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 PAGE 3 OF 13) (ghap)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, re Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 served on September 16, 2019. (McClendon, Regina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-01846-AG-DFM, 9:19-cv-01268 (McClendon, Regina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, identifying LSF6 Service Operations, LLC; LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC; U.S. Bancorp. (McClendon, Regina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (McClendon, Regina)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01090728 Receipt No: 0973-24441043 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2) (Attorney Regina J McClendon added to party Caliber Home Loans, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Regina J McClendon added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust(pty:dft))(McClendon, Regina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chang Woo v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chang Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Represented By: Simon M Feng
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Simon M Feng
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?