Jaimie Davis v. WFP Securities Corp et al
Petitioner: JAIMIE DAVIS
Respondent: WFP SECURITIES CORP., CURTIS J. SATHRE, III, JOHN E. SCHOOLER and WFP Secuities Corp.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01763
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Petitioner Jaimie Davis. (es)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 **AMENDED** TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Orange. (es)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, Stanley Mosk. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, Stanley Mosk. (es)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] Order Remanding Case by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has made a preliminary review of the jurisdictional allegations in the: Notice of Removal ("Notice") filed by Curtis J. Sathre III ("Sathre") on September 16, 2019. Removal is barred. The case is remanded on the Court's own motion to the Superior Court for the State of California, County of Orange. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) remanding case to Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (es)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Respondent Curtis J. Sathre, III. Amendment to Request for Judicial Notice #8 Amended [Proposed] Order (Reif, Brandon)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition #7 filed by Respondent Curtis J. Sathre, III. (Reif, Brandon)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition filed by Attorney for Respondent Curtis J. Sathre, III. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration in Superior Court for the County of Orange, #2 Proposed Order) (Reif, Brandon)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
September 16, 2019 (PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO VACATE ABSTRACTS OF JUDGMENTS AND LIENS: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF) COMPLAINT against Respondents Curtis J. Sathre, III, John E. Schooler, WFP Secuities Corp., filed by petitioner Jaimie Davis. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/6/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for Respondent CURTIS J. SATHRE, III, (Reif, Brandon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Respondent CURTIS J. SATHRE, III. (Reif, Brandon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01088210-CU-PT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24445550 - Fee: $400, filed by ATTORNEY FOR RESPONDENT CURTIS J. SATHRE, III. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of State Court Pleadings) (Attorney Brandon Scott Reif added to party CURTIS J. SATHRE, III(pty:res))(Reif, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaimie Davis v. WFP Securities Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WFP SECURITIES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CURTIS J. SATHRE, III
Represented By: Brandon Scott Reif
Represented By: Rebecca E MacLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN E. SCHOOLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WFP Secuities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAIMIE DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?