Helen Xiong v. Jeunesse Global, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Helen Xiong and Huiqin Xiong
Defendant: Jeunesse Global, LLC, Kim Hui, DOES 1-10, and Jeunesse, Llc
Case Number: 8:2019cv01780
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY Reply in support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 filed by Plaintiff Helen Xiong. (Lindemann, Blake)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida ; Compel Arbitration; and/or Strike Plaintiff's Class Action Allegations #15 filed by Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida ; Compel Arbitration; and/or Strike Plaintiff's Class Action Allegations #15 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 . The Court finds these matters appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearings set for 11/18/2019 are removed from the calendar and the motions are taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #17 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey J. Jacobson ISO Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey J. Jacobson SO Opposition to Remand, #3 Proof of Service)(Jacobson, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida ; Compel Arbitration; and/or Strike Plaintiff's Class Action Allegations #15 Brief Re: Request To Strike Class Allegations filed by Plaintiff Helen Xiong. (Lindemann, Blake)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida ; Compel Arbitration; and/or Strike Plaintiff's Class Action Allegations #15 filed by Plaintiff Helen Xiong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen Xiong, #2 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #3 Exhibit 1-8)(Lindemann, Blake)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Class Plaintiff Helen Xiong. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Blake J. Lindemann, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proposed Order) (Lindemann, Blake)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida ; Compel Arbitration; and/or Strike Plaintiff's Class Action Allegations filed by Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, GRANTING JOINT Stipulation to set Briefing Schedule #13 . (1) Defendants may file a combined motion to (a) transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, (b) compel arbitration of Ms. Xiongs claims, and/or (c) strike the class claims from Ms. Xiongs Complaint, no later than October 2, 2019; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Amended STIPULATION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule filed by Joint Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended [Proposed] Orer)(Jacobson, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. correcting Stipulation for Hearing #11 (Salzman, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salzman, Ryan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:18-cv-01430 DOC (KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01780 DOC (KESx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (esa)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #7 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S Jacobson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC, designating Ryan M Salzman as local counsel. (jp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/20/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24476921) filed by Defendants Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman added to party Kim Hui(pty:dft)) (Salzman, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
September 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Kim Hui, Jeunesse Global, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Helen Xiong. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/04/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Jeunesse, Llc identifying Jeunesse, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Salzman, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jeunesse Global, LLC, identifying Jeunesse, LLC. (Salzman, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jeunesse Global, LLC. (Salzman, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01095448 with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 09/17/2019, receipt number 0973-24453128), filed by Defendant Jeunesse Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration) (Attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman added to party Jeunesse Global, LLC(pty:dft))(Salzman, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helen Xiong v. Jeunesse Global, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Xiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huiqin Xiong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeunesse Global, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Hui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeunesse, Llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?