Kimberly Frazier v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY FRAZIER
Defendant: WANDA TEAZIS, LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC., DOES 1 through 10 and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Little Caesars Pizza No 5825
Case Number: 8:2019cv01795
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE #12 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 45 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/25/2019. (rrp)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Hurley, Gregory)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc..(Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hurley, Gregory)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc., Wanda Teazis. (car)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY FRAZIER, (Kim, Jason)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY FRAZIER. (Kim, Jason)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY FRAZIER. (Kim, Jason)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24468730 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY FRAZIER. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party KIMBERLY FRAZIER(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimberly Frazier v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA TEAZIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Bradley J Leimkuhler
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Michael J Chilleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Little Caesars Pizza No 5825
Represented By: Bradley J Leimkuhler
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Michael J Chilleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY FRAZIER
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?